blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0974683

EP0974683 - SURFACE TREATING AGENT OF STEEL MATERIAL AND SURFACE-TREATED STEEL MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.11.2006
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip10.11.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.12.2006  [2006/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi
Osaka 541-0041 / JP
For all designated states
SHINTO PAINT COMPANY, LIMITED
10-73, Minamitsukaguchi-cho 6-chome Amagasaki-shi
Hyogo 661 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-Shi, Osaka 541 / JP
For all designated states
SHINTO PAINT COMPANY, LIMITED
10-73, Minamitsukaguchi-cho 6-chome
Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 661 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KISHIKAWA, Hirofumi-Sumitomo Metal Industries, Ltd.
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome,Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP
02 / YAMASHITA, Masato-Sumitomo Metal Industries, Ltd.
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome
Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP
03 / KANDA, Atsumu-Shinto Paint Co., Ltd.
10-73, Minami-Tsukaguchicho 6-chome
Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 661 / JP
04 / ONO, Hiroshi, Shinto Paint Co., Ltd.
10-73, Minami-Tsukaguchicho 6-chome
Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 661 / JP
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Geering, Keith Edwin
Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London
WC1X 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Geering, Keith Edwin
REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date98900689.522.01.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998JP00228
Priority number, dateJP1997002842827.01.1997         Original published format: JP 2842897
[2000/04]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9832895
Date:30.07.1998
Language:EN
[1998/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974683
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP30.07.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.05.2005
ClassificationIPC:C23C22/50
[2000/04]
CPC:
C09D129/14 (EP,KR,US); C23C22/50 (KR); C08L61/06 (EP,US);
C23C2222/10 (KR)
C-Set:
C09D129/14, C08L2666/14, C08L2666/54 (EP,US);
C09D129/14, C08L2666/54 (US,EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/04]
TitleGerman:OBERFLÄCHENBEHANDLUNGSLÖSUNG FÜR STAHL UND OBERFLÄCHENBEHANDELTER STAHL[2000/04]
English:SURFACE TREATING AGENT OF STEEL MATERIAL AND SURFACE-TREATED STEEL MATERIAL[2000/04]
French:AGENT TENSIO-ACTIF POUR ACIER, ET L'ACIER AINSI TRAITE[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase30.07.1999Translation filed 
12.08.1999National basic fee paid 
12.08.1999Search fee paid 
12.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
12.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.03.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
12.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
25.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.12.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.01.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.06.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/50]
18.07.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2006/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
14.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
14.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
14.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
12.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
12.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH08325506  ;
 [A]JPH06136557  ;
 [A]US4578122  (CROTTY DAVID E [US]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * column 7, line 43 - line 49 *;
 [A]US4671825  (ISHII TORU [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * column 3, line 9 - line 12 * * column 3, line 26 - line 36 * * column 3, line 56 - line 66 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970430), vol. 1997, no. 04, & JP08325506 A 19961210 (R SHII I:KK; NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1,2 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940822), vol. 018, no. 448, Database accession no. (C - 1240), & JP06136557 A 19940517 (SUMITOMO METAL IND LTD) [A] 1,2 * abstract *
International search[A]JPS5077236  ;
 [A]JPH05156466  (SUMITOMO METAL IND);
 [A]JPH06136557  (SUMITOMO METAL IND)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.