EP0904572 - METHOD FOR FIXING A WATCHBAND TO A WATCH CASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.01.2006 [2006/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Omega SA Rue Stämpfli 96 2500 Bienne / CH | [1999/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAGNOUX, Gérard Chemin de Collex F-01210 Ferney Voltaire / FR | [1999/13] | Representative(s) | Ravenel, Thierry Gérard Louis, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1999/13] | Ravenel, Thierry Gérard Louis, et al I C B, Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA, 7, rue des Sors 2074 Marin / CH | Application number, filing date | 98900835.4 | 30.01.1998 | [1999/13] | WO1998CH00035 | Priority number, date | FR19970001319 | 31.01.1997 Original published format: FR 9701319 | [1999/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9834163 | Date: | 06.08.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0904572 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0904572 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G04B37/14, A44C5/14 | [1999/13] | CPC: |
A44C5/14 (EP,US);
G04B37/14 (KR);
G04B37/1486 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1999/13] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEFESTIGUNG EINES ARMBANDES AN EINEM UHRENGEHÄUSE | [1999/13] | English: | METHOD FOR FIXING A WATCHBAND TO A WATCH CASE | [1999/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR LA FIXATION D'UN BRACELET A UNE BOITE DE MONTRE | [1999/13] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/14] | 13.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2265297 (CHIL ET FILS P [FR]) [A] 1,8 * page 2, line 23 - page 3, line 21; figures 1,2 *; | [A]FR2278286 (HEROLD GILBERT [FR]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0052316 (RODI & WIENERBERGER AG) [A] 1,2 * page 10, line 6 - line 28; figure 2 *; | [A]CH647379 (NOVAVIT) [A] 1 * page 3, line 42 - line 49; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0461069 (BRATEC BAUMGARTNER & BRANCALEO [CH]) [A] 1,9 * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 34 * * column 5, line 15 - line 29; figures 4,5,7 *; | [A]US5146437 (BOUCHERON ALAIN [FR]) [A] 9* column 3, line 28 - line 42; figure 4 *; | [A]EP0664093 (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 28 - line 43; figure 2 * |