Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5673498 | Global Dossier | 07.08.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9800177 | 21.01.1998 | GB9701161 | 21.01.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1024921 | Global Dossier | 11.06.2003 | B1 | EP1024921 | 09.08.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9800177 | 21.01.1998 | GB9701161 | 21.01.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69815548D1 | 17.07.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | GB9800177 | 21.01.1998 | GB9701161 | 21.01.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO318463B | 21.03.2005 | B1 | NO993559L | 17.09.1999 | L | NO993559D0 | 20.07.1999 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB9800177 | 21.01.1998 | GB9701161 | 21.01.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6220498 | 24.04.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | GB9800177 | 21.01.1998 | GB9701161 | 21.01.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9831499 | Global Dossier | 23.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9701161 | 21.01.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB9701161D0 | 12.03.1997 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB9701161 | 21.01.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ID22986A | 23.12.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9701161 | 21.01.1997 |