EP1024921 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR WELDING AND INSPECTING COILED TUBING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agais Offshore Limited 7 Ritchie Place Edinburgh EH11 1DT / GB | [2000/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GORDON, Alec 7 Ritchie Place Edinburgh EH11 1DT / GB | 02 /
THOMSON, Ashley 4 Mary's Place Edinburgh EH4 1JH / GB | [2000/32] | Representative(s) | Murnane, Graham John, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/32] | Murnane, Graham John, et al Murgitroyd & Company, 373 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8QA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98900931.1 | 21.01.1998 | [2000/32] | WO1998GB00177 | Priority number, date | GB19970001161 | 21.01.1997 Original published format: GB 9701161 | [2000/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9831499 | Date: | 23.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1024921 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1024921 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B23K37/053, E21B17/20 | [2000/32] | CPC: |
B23K37/0533 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, GB, IT, NL [2000/32] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM SCHWEISSEN UND PRÜFEN VON GEWICKELTEM ROHRSTRANG | [2003/04] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR WELDING AND INSPECTING COILED TUBING | [2000/32] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE SOUDER ET D'EXAMINER UN SERPENTIN | [2000/32] |
Former [2000/32] | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM SCHWEISSEN UND PRÜFEN VOM GEWICKELTEN ROHRSTRANG | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.07.1999 | Examination requested [2000/32] | 11.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 11.06.2003 | NL | 11.06.2003 | DK | 11.09.2003 | DE | 12.09.2003 | [2008/15] |
Former [2004/29] | NL | 11.06.2003 | |
DK | 11.09.2003 | ||
DE | 12.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | NL | 11.06.2003 | |
DE | 12.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | NL | 11.06.2003 | Cited in | International search | [X]SU1407734 ; | [X]US3641777 (BANJAVICH MARK P, et al) [X] 1-3,5 * abstract *; | [Y]US4528436 (STOL ISRAEL [US]) [Y] 12,14-16* abstract *; | [YA]US4629218 (DUBOIS JON D [US]) [Y] 12,14-16 * column 1, line 19 - line 25 * * column 2, line 49 - line 58 * * column 3, line 24 - line 33 * [A] 13; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 89, no. 03, Database accession no. 89-021899, XP002064119 & SU1407734 A 19880707 (KIEV WORK HYGIENE - MOSC MAINS PIPES) [X] 1-11 * abstract * |