EP0956459 - BEARING ASSEMBLY AND MANUFACTURING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.12.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.02.2005 [2005/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Glacier Garlock Bearings Inc. c/o The Corporation Trust Company, 1209 Orange Street Wilmington Delaware 19801-1120 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | For all designated states Glacier Garlock Bearings Inc. c/o The Corporation Trust Company, 1209 Orange Street Wilmington, Delaware 19801-1120 / US | ||
Former [1999/46] | For all designated states DANA CORPORATION 3222 W. Central Avenue Toledo, OH 43615 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCMEEKIN, Kenneth, Macleod 6 Berridale Road, Balassie Troon, Ayrshire KA10 6TJ / GB | [1999/46] | Representative(s) | Hammler, Martin Franz, et al Phillips & Leigh 5 Pemberton Row London EC4A 3BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/15] | Hammler, Martin Franz, et al Phillips & Leigh 5 Pemberton Row London EC4A 3BA / GB | ||
Former [1999/46] | Goddard, David John, et al Harrison Goddard Foote, 1 Stockport Road, Marple Stockport SK6 6BD / GB | Application number, filing date | 98900947.7 | 22.01.1998 | [1999/46] | WO1998GB00199 | Priority number, date | GB19970001777 | 29.01.1997 Original published format: GB 9701777 | GB19970023152 | 04.11.1997 Original published format: GB 9723152 | [1999/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9832984 | Date: | 30.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0956459 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F16C33/20, F16C33/14 | [1999/46] | CPC: |
F16C33/201 (EP,US);
F16C17/026 (EP,US);
F16C33/04 (EP,US);
F16C33/1065 (EP,US);
F16C33/14 (EP,US);
F16C2220/20 (EP,US);
F16C2220/44 (EP,US);
F16C2220/82 (EP,US);
F16C2223/32 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1999/46] | Title | German: | LAGERANORDNUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [1999/46] | English: | BEARING ASSEMBLY AND MANUFACTURING METHOD | [1999/46] | French: | ENSEMBLE PALIER ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [1999/46] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/46] | 22.05.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/06] | 07.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/06] | Request for further processing for: | 15.04.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 15.04.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.05.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2004 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5129739 (ASAI HIROMITSU [JP], et al) [A] 1,20 * column W *; | [A]JPS5611225 ; | [A]FR2214063 (GARLOCK INC [US]); | [A]US4774749 (FURUMURA KYOZABURO [JP]); | [A]FR2073172 (GLYCO METALL WERKE [DE]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810418), vol. 005, no. 057, Database accession no. (M - 064), & JP56011225 A 19810204 (MITSUBISHI PLASTICS IND LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | GB2172296 | GB2248238 | GB2279998 |