EP0954673 - APPARATUS FOR DIRECTING AND STEERING THE FOREMOST PART OF A DRILLPIPE AT DRILLINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.12.2004 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.01.2005 [2005/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VAN DEN BERGH, Johannes, Wilhelmus, Henricus Lindenlaan 27 NL-1861 HA Bergen / NL | [1999/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/45] | Representative(s) | Koomen, M.J.I., et al Kennemerstraatweg 35 1814 GB Alkmaar / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1999/45] | Koomen, M.J.I., et al Kennemerstraatweg 35-37 1814 GB Alkmaar / NL | Application number, filing date | 98901126.7 | 22.01.1998 | [1999/45] | WO1998NL00045 | Priority number, date | NL19971005055 | 22.01.1997 Original published format: NL 1005055 | [1999/45] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9831915 | Date: | 23.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0954673 | Date: | 10.11.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | E21B7/06, E21B17/046 | [1999/45] | CPC: |
E21B23/006 (EP);
E21B17/046 (EP,US);
E21B7/067 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/45] | Extension states | AL | 20.08.1999 | LT | 20.08.1999 | LV | 20.08.1999 | MK | 20.08.1999 | RO | 20.08.1999 | SI | 20.08.1999 | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM RICHTEN DES VORDERTEILS EINES BOHRROHRES | [1999/45] | English: | APPARATUS FOR DIRECTING AND STEERING THE FOREMOST PART OF A DRILLPIPE AT DRILLINGS | [1999/45] | French: | DISPOSITIF CON U POUR DIRIGER ET PILOTER LA PARTIE LA PLUS A L'AVANT D'UNE TIGE DE SONDE SUR DES SITES DE FORAGE | [1999/45] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.1998 | Translation filed | 20.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 20.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/45] | 12.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/03] | 19.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2005/03] | Request for further processing for: | 05.02.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 06.02.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.03.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2004 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2023428 (LIEBHARDT FREDERICK C) [Y] 4-6 * figure - *; | [A]US3356389 (FREDD JOHN V) [A] 1,9 * abstract ** figure - *; | [Y]US4610465 (BOYADJIEFF GEORGE I [US]) [Y] 2-6 * column A; figure - *; | [YD]WO9108370 (BERGH JOHANNES W H DEN [NL]) [YD] 9 * page 9, line 29 - page 11, line 32 * * figure - *; | [XY]US5048621 (BAILEY THOMAS F [US], et al) [X] 1,7,8 * column 4, line 27 - line 45; figure - * [Y] 2-6; | [A]GB2246406 (EXPLORATION & PROD SERV [GB]) [A] 1,9 * the whole document *; | [Y]GB2260351 (OTIS ENG CO [US]) [Y] 9 * page 22, paragraph 3 * * page 24, paragraph 1 * * figures 2F,5 *; | [X]EP0561072 (CANADIAN FRACMASTER LTD [CA]) [X] 1,7,8 * column 6, line 16 - line 42; figure - *; | [A]EP0571045 (ANADRILL INT SA [PA], et al) [A] 1,9 * page 5, column 7, line 43 - page 6, column 9, line 5 * * figures 2,3 * | by applicant | NL9001883 | EP0502084 |