blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0988096

EP0988096 - BICYCLE TREADMILL WITH SINGLE TURNTABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.06.2004
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip11.06.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.07.2004  [2004/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Trotter, Edward E.
4545 Gandy Boulevard
Tampa, FL 33611 / US
[2000/13]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/13]
Representative(s)Goddard, Frances Anna
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/28]Goddard, Frances Anna
D Young & Co 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Former [2000/26]Boden, Keith McMurray, et al
D. Young & Co. 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Former [2000/13]Purvis, William Michael Cameron
D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date98901202.614.01.1998
[2000/13]
WO1998US00281
Priority number, dateUS1997085308608.05.1997         Original published format: US 853086
[2000/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9850117
Date:12.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0988096
Date:29.03.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US12.11.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.05.2002
ClassificationIPC:A63B69/16
[2000/13]
CPC:
A63B69/16 (EP,US); A63B2069/162 (EP,US); A63B2069/165 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/13]
Extension statesAL10.11.1999
LT10.11.1999
LV10.11.1999
MK10.11.1999
RO10.11.1999
SI10.11.1999
TitleGerman:LAUFBAND MIT EINEM EINZELDREHTISCH FÜR EIN FAHRRAD[2000/13]
English:BICYCLE TREADMILL WITH SINGLE TURNTABLE[2000/13]
French:TAPIS ROULANT A UN SEUL PLATEAU POUR BICYCLETTE[2000/13]
Entry into regional phase10.11.1999National basic fee paid 
10.11.1999Search fee paid 
10.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
10.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
10.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/13]
03.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.11.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/31]
23.02.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2004/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
25.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
17.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200407   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US4061460  (GEORGE JOHN) [A] 1* abstract *
International search[A]US534223  ;
 [A]US4061460  (GEORGE JOHN);
 [A]US4932651  (DEFAUX GEORGES [CO]);
 [A]US5492516  (TROTTER EDWARD E [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.