EP0967879 - BAKING MEANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Westbergh, Jan Etelhem 620 13 Stanga / SE | [2000/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/01] | Representative(s) | Arwidi, Bengt Willquist & Partners Patentbyra AB Gjuterigatan 9 553 18 Jönköping / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/22] | Arwidi, Bengt Willquist & Partners Patentbyra AB Gjuterigatan 9 553 18 Jönköping / SE | ||
Former [2000/01] | Arwidi, Bengt Dr. AHLPATENT AB Förborgsgatan 27 554 39 Jönköping / SE | Application number, filing date | 98901609.2 | 09.01.1998 | [2000/01] | WO1998SE00006 | Priority number, date | SE19970000160 | 21.01.1997 Original published format: SE 9700160 | [2000/01] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9831230 | Date: | 23.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0967879 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0967879 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 23.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A21B3/07, F24C15/16 | [2000/01] | CPC: |
A21B3/07 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/01] | Title | German: | BACKVORRICHTUNG | [2000/01] | English: | BAKING MEANS | [2000/01] | French: | MOYENS DE CUISSON DE BOULANGERIE | [2000/01] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.1998 | Translation filed | 03.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 03.07.1999 | Examination requested [2000/01] | 06.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.08.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 04.09.2002 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 02.10.2002 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request granted | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 09.04.2003 | FR | 09.04.2003 | IT | 09.04.2003 | NL | 09.04.2003 | DK | 09.07.2003 | DE | 10.07.2003 | ES | 30.10.2003 | GB | 09.01.2004 | [2008/15] |
Former [2006/14] | FI | 09.04.2003 | |
FR | 09.04.2003 | ||
NL | 09.04.2003 | ||
DK | 09.07.2003 | ||
DE | 10.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
GB | 09.01.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | FI | 09.04.2003 | |
NL | 09.04.2003 | ||
DK | 09.07.2003 | ||
DE | 10.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
GB | 09.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/23] | FI | 09.04.2003 | |
NL | 09.04.2003 | ||
DK | 09.07.2003 | ||
DE | 10.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | FI | 09.04.2003 | |
NL | 09.04.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | NL | 09.04.2003 | |
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | NL | 09.04.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB189424278 ; | [A]US4020310 ; | [A]DE2616329 ; | [A]WO9211765 |