EP1047767 - GRANULAR COMPOSITIONS HAVING IMPROVED DISSOLUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2005 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/32] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | ||
Former [2000/44] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORT, Paul, R., III 510 Compton Road Cincinnati, OH 45215 / US | 02 /
NORWOOD, Kevin, Todd 935 Winsray Court Cincinnati, OH 45224 / US | [2000/44] | Representative(s) | Brooks, Maxim Courtney, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/05] | Brooks, Maxim Courtney, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited, Whitley Road, Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | ||
Former [2000/44] | Peet, Jillian Wendy, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited, Whitley Road, Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | Application number, filing date | 98901782.7 | 13.01.1998 | [2000/44] | WO1998US00567 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9936503 | Date: | 22.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1047767 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1047767 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C11D17/06, C11D1/37, C11D1/83, // (C11D3/02, 3:06, 3:10, 3:12) | [2000/44] | CPC: |
C11D17/065 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/44] | Title | German: | GRANULARE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT VERBESSERTER AUFLÖSUNG | [2000/44] | English: | GRANULAR COMPOSITIONS HAVING IMPROVED DISSOLUTION | [2000/44] | French: | COMPOSITIONS GRANULEES PRESENTANT UNE APTITUDE AMELIOREE A LA DISSOLUTION | [2000/44] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/44] | 13.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.08.2004 | BE | 04.08.2004 | CH | 04.08.2004 | FI | 04.08.2004 | LI | 04.08.2004 | DK | 04.11.2004 | GR | 04.11.2004 | SE | 04.11.2004 | PT | 04.01.2005 | IE | 13.01.2005 | LU | 13.01.2005 | [2008/15] |
Former [2007/17] | AT | 04.08.2004 | |
BE | 04.08.2004 | ||
CH | 04.08.2004 | ||
FI | 04.08.2004 | ||
LI | 04.08.2004 | ||
DK | 04.11.2004 | ||
GR | 04.11.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
IE | 13.01.2005 | ||
LU | 13.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/24] | AT | 04.08.2004 | |
BE | 04.08.2004 | ||
CH | 04.08.2004 | ||
FI | 04.08.2004 | ||
LI | 04.08.2004 | ||
DK | 04.11.2004 | ||
GR | 04.11.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
IE | 13.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT | 04.08.2004 | |
BE | 04.08.2004 | ||
CH | 04.08.2004 | ||
FI | 04.08.2004 | ||
LI | 04.08.2004 | ||
DK | 04.11.2004 | ||
GR | 04.11.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 04.08.2004 | |
CH | 04.08.2004 | ||
FI | 04.08.2004 | ||
LI | 04.08.2004 | ||
DK | 04.11.2004 | ||
GR | 04.11.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 04.08.2004 | |
CH | 04.08.2004 | ||
FI | 04.08.2004 | ||
LI | 04.08.2004 | ||
GR | 04.11.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 04.08.2004 | |
FI | 04.08.2004 | ||
GR | 04.11.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 04.08.2004 | |
FI | 04.08.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 04.08.2004 | |
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 04.11.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2116200 (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [A] 1-10 * page 1, line 4 - line 20 * * page 1, line 60 - page 2, line 32 * * page 3, line 48 - line 54 *; | [A]EP0220024 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-10 *; | [A]US5080848 (STRAUSS DANIEL L [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-8 ** column 8, line 46 - line 50 *; | [A]US5152932 (MUELLER FRANK J [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 4, line 4 - line 27 * * column 6, line 63 - column 7, line 24 *; | [A]US5366652 (CAPECI SCOTT W [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 5, line 5 - line 17 * * example 1 * * claims 1-3 *; | [A]EP0643130 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 10, line 17 - line 30 * * page 8, line 30 - line 52 * * example 1 *; | [A]US5431857 (CAPECI SCOTT W [US]) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-3 * * example 1 *; | [A]GB2289687 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 3, line 5 - line 37 * * claims 1-10 *; | [A]US5494599 (GOOVAERTS LUCAS [BE], et al) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-6 * |