EP0973454 - PROBE ASSEMBLY FOR IMPROVED CATHETER CALIBRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/04] | IMPROVED CATHETER CALIBRATION | ||
[2006/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.11.2007 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biosense Webster, Inc. 3333 Diamond Canyon Road Diamond Bar, CA 91765 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/03] | For all designated states Biosense Webster, Inc. 3333 Diamond Canyon Road Diamond Bar California 91765 / US | ||
Former [2004/45] | For all designated states Biosense Webster, Inc. 3333 Diamond Canyon Road Diamond Bar, California 91765 / US | ||
Former [2000/04] | For all designated states Biosense Inc. Suite 10, 40 Ramland Road South Orangeburg, NY 10962 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSADCHY, Daniel Harofe Street 48A 34367 Haifa / IL | 02 /
MATCOVITCH, Avraham Yasmin Street 6/3 36780 Nesher / IL | [2000/04] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/04] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98902164.7 | 10.02.1998 | [2000/04] | WO1998IL00064 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9940856 | Date: | 19.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0973454 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0973454 | Date: | 17.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.08.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/14, A61B5/06, A61B17/00 | [2006/29] | CPC: |
A61B5/06 (EP,US);
A61B34/20 (EP,US);
A61B5/062 (EP,US);
A61B90/98 (EP,US);
A61B18/1492 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00482 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00725 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00178 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2051 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2068 (EP,US);
A61B2034/256 (EP,US);
A61B2090/0818 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3983 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2002/12] | A61B17/36, A61B5/06 | ||
Former IPC [2000/04] | A61B17/36 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/04] | Title | German: | SONDENANORDNUNG ZUR VERBESSERTEN KATHETERKALIBRIERUNG | [2006/25] | English: | PROBE ASSEMBLY FOR IMPROVED CATHETER CALIBRATION | [2006/25] | French: | ENSEMBLE SONDE POUR ETALONNAGE AMELIORE DE CATHETER | [2006/25] |
Former [2000/04] | VERBESSERTE KATHETERKALIBRIERUNG | ||
Former [2000/04] | IMPROVED CATHETER CALIBRATION | ||
Former [2000/04] | ETALONNAGE AMELIORE DE CATHETER | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.1999 | Search fee paid | 03.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/04] | 20.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.06.2006 | 15.05.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 01.06.2006 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 07.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5193547 (EVANS II GEORGE D [US], et al); | [A]US5400267 (DENEN DENNIS J [US], et al); | [A]WO9607351 (CARDIOMETRICS INC [US]); | [Y]EP0712603 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]); | [Y]WO9729678 (BIOSENSE INC [US], et al); | [E]WO9842253 (RADI MEDICAL SYSTEMS [SE], et al) | International search | [A]US5211165 (DUMOULIN CHARLES L [US], et al); | [A]US5318025 (DUMOULIN CHARLES L [US], et al); | [A]US5377678 (DUMOULIN CHARLES L [US], et al); | [Y]US5383874 (JACKSON JEROME [US], et al); | [A]US5445150 (DUMOULIN CHARLES L [US], et al) | by applicant | US3644825 | US3868565 | US4017858 | US4054881 | US4849692 | US5042486 | WO9404938 | US5391199 |