EP0940857 - THIN FILM PHOTOELECTRIC TRANSDUCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 21.09.2012 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2012 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KANEKA CORPORATION 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0005 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | For all designated states KANEKA CORPORATION 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0005 / JP | ||
Former [1999/36] | For all designated states Kaneka Corporation 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0005 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAJIMA, Akihiko 1-20-3, Jonan-cho Shikama-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 672-8083 / JP | 02 /
YOSHIMI, Masashi 1-1-324-403, Kitaochiai Suma-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 654-0151 / JP | 03 /
SUZUKI, Takayuki 2-2-18-202, Minamishiga Otsu-shi Shiga 520-0011 / JP | 04 /
YAMAMOTO, Kenji 2-W1406, Mikata-dai 1-chome Nishi-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-2277 / JP | [2012/43] |
Former [1999/36] | 01 /
NAKAJIMA, Akihiko 1-20-3, Jonan-cho Shikama-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 672-8083 / JP | ||
02 /
YOSHIMI, Masashi 1-1-324-403, Kitaochiai Suma-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 654-0151 / JP | |||
03 /
SUZUKI, Takayuki 2-2-18-202, Minamishiga Otsu-shi Shiga 520-0011 / JP | |||
04 /
YAMAMOTO, Kenji 2-W1406, Mikata-dai 1-chome Nishi-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-2277 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/43] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/25] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/36] | Watkin, Timothy Lawrence Harvey, et al Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway London, WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 98902190.2 | 12.02.1998 | [1999/36] | WO1998JP00556 | Priority number, date | JP19970242126 | 21.08.1997 Original published format: JP 24212697 | [1999/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9910933 | Date: | 04.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0940857 | Date: | 08.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0940857 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/48] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0940857 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.03.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/04, H01L31/0368, H01L31/0392 | [1999/49] | CPC: |
H01L31/076 (EP,US);
H01L31/0236 (US);
H01L31/02363 (EP);
H01L31/02366 (EP);
H01L31/056 (EP,US);
H01L31/075 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1999/36] | H01L31/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1999/36] | Title | German: | DÜNNSCHICHT PHOTOELEKTRISCHER WANDLER | [1999/36] | English: | THIN FILM PHOTOELECTRIC TRANSDUCER | [1999/36] | French: | TRANSDUCTEUR PHOTOELECTRIQUE A COUCHE MINCE | [1999/36] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.1999 | Translation filed | 10.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.1999 | Search fee paid | 10.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/36] | 20.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP09012398.5 / EP2136410 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
24.08.2010
07.09.2010
ADMISSIBLE Schott AG / Schott Solar Thin Film GmbH Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE Opponent's representative Berngruber, Otto vP-IP von Puttkamer Berngruber Loth Spuhler Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten und Rechtsanwälten mbB Türkenstrasse 9 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/48] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.08.2010
07.09.2010
ADMISSIBLE Schott AG / Schott Solar Thin Film GmbH Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE Opponent's representative Berngruber, Otto von Puttkamer · Berngruber Patentanwälte Türkenstraße 9 DE-80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/46] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.08.2010
07.09.2010
ADMISSIBLE Schott AG / Schott Solar Thin Film GmbH Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | ||
Former [2010/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.08.2010
Schott AG Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | 29.09.2010 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 07.04.2011 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 09.02.2012 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 09.02.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.03.2012 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 05.03.2012 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 28.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 03.09.2012 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5221365 (NOGUCHI SHIGERU [JP], et al) [A] 1,3,5,11 * column 6, line 15 - line 48 * * column 9, line 12 - line 21; figures 4,11 *; | [PA] - NAKAJIMA A ET AL, "Enhancement of optical absorption for below 5 mum thin-film poly -Si solar cell on glass substrate", SOLAR ENERGY MATERIALS AND SOLAR CELLS, (19971101), vol. 48, no. 1-4, ISSN 0927-0248, page 287-294, XP004111860 [PA] 1-3,5,6,12,13 * page 288; figures 3,4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0927-0248(97)00114-1 | International search | [Y]JPS59124772 (HAMAKAWA YOSHIHIRO, et al); | [Y]JPS6245079 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND); | [X]JPH04334069 (CANON KK); | [Y]JPH06342923 (ASUTOROPAWAA INC); | [Y]JPH07122764 (HITACHI LTD) | Examination | US5282902 | EP0591949 | JPH09307130 | by applicant | JPS6245079B | US5282902 | EP0591949 | JPH07122764B |