EP0905455 - OUTDOOR UNIT OF AN AIR CONDITIONER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/13] | OUTDOOR UNIT OF SEPARATE TYPE AIR CONDITIONER | ||
[2002/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LIMITED Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-0015 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/13] | For all designated states Daikin Industries, Limited Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0015 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHENG, Zhiming Kanoaka-kojo Sakai-seisakusho Daikin Industries, Ltd. 1304, Kanaoka-cho Saikai-shi Osaka 591-8022 / JP | 02 /
SATO, Seiji Kanaoka-kojo Sakai-seisakusho Daikin Industries, Ltd. 1304, Kanaoka-cho Sakai-shi Osaka 591-8022 / JP | [1999/13] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/13] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98902248.8 | 17.02.1998 | [1999/13] | WO1998JP00636 | Priority number, date | JP19970083759 | 02.04.1997 Original published format: JP 8375997 | [1999/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9844299 | Date: | 08.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0905455 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0905455 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.10.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F24F5/00, F24F13/08, F24F1/00, F24F13/075, F24F13/24 | [2000/14] | CPC: |
F24F1/56 (EP);
F24F5/00 (KR);
F04D29/667 (EP);
F04D29/703 (EP);
F24F13/075 (EP);
F24F13/08 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1999/13] | F24F5/00, F24F13/08 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, NL, PT [1999/13] | Title | German: | AUSSENEINHEIT FÜR EINE KLIMAANLAGE | [2002/46] | English: | OUTDOOR UNIT OF AN AIR CONDITIONER | [2002/46] | French: | UNITE EXTERIEURE D'UN CONDITIONNEUR D'AIR | [2002/46] |
Former [1999/13] | AUSSENEINHEIT FÜR KLIMAANLAGE MIT GETRENNTEN GERÄTEN | ||
Former [1999/13] | OUTDOOR UNIT OF SEPARATE TYPE AIR CONDITIONER | ||
Former [1999/13] | UNITE EXTERIEURE D'UN CONDITIONNEUR D'AIR DE TYPE SEPARE | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.1998 | Translation filed | 19.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.1998 | Search fee paid | 19.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/13] | 11.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 02.05.2003 | GR | 02.08.2003 | PT | 04.08.2003 | [2004/28] |
Former [2004/02] | GR | 02.08.2003 | |
PT | 04.08.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4976115 (HOGAN MARK R [US]) [X] 1-4,14 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP0711925 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 5 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPH0571766 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JPH0536220U ; | [X]JPH05264070 |