EP1015555 - ANTIFUNGAL BIOCONTROL AGENTS, A PROCESS FOR PREPARING AND TREATING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2004 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.02.2004 [2004/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Suh, Hyung Won 311-203, Jugong Apt., Sanggye-dong Nowon-ku Seoul 139-200 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/27] | For all designated states Suh, Hyung Won 311-203, Jugong Apt., Sanggye-dong Nowon-ku, Seoul 139-200 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/27] | Representative(s) | Nevant, Marc, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/27] | Nevant, Marc, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 98902271.0 | 24.01.1998 | [2000/27] | WO1998KR00015 | Priority number, date | KR19970000356 | 05.02.1997 Original published format: KR 1997356 | [2000/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9835017 | Date: | 13.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1015555 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 13.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/20, A01N63/00, // (C12N1/20, C12R1:465) | [2000/27] | CPC: |
C12P1/06 (EP,US);
C12N1/205 (EP,US);
A01N63/28 (EP,US);
C12R2001/465 (EP,US);
Y10S435/886 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/27] | Title | German: | FUNGIZIDE BIOKONTROLLWIRKSTOFFE UND VERFAHREN FÜR IHRE HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG. | [2000/27] | English: | ANTIFUNGAL BIOCONTROL AGENTS, A PROCESS FOR PREPARING AND TREATING THE SAME | [2000/27] | French: | AGENTS DE LUTTE BIOLOGIQUE ANTIFONGIQUE ET PROCEDE D'ELABORATION ET D'UTILISATION | [2000/27] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT | 05.08.1999 | Examination requested [2000/27] | 03.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/09] | 17.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4595589 (TAHVONEN RISTO [FI]); | [A]EP0408811 (KEMIRA OY [FI]); | [A]WO9318135 (RES CORP TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]); | [A]WO9501099 (IDAHO RES FOUND [US], et al) |