blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0967890

EP0967890 - LIQUID, TRANSPARENT MIXTURE BASED ON LACTITOL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.10.2006
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip25.04.2008Change - representativepublished on 28.05.2008  [2008/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Purac Biochem B.V.
Arkelsedijk 46, P.O.Box 21
4200 AA Gorinchem / NL
[N/P]
Former [2005/48]For all designated states
Purac Biochem B.V.
Arkelsedijk 46, P.O.Box 21
4200 AA Gorinchem / NL
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
PURAC BIOCHEM B.V.
Arkelsedijk 46, P.O.Box 21
4200 AA Gorinchem / NL
Inventor(s)01 / BLANKERS, Izak Hendrik
No. 02-40 Goldhill Towers, 38 Goldhill Avenue
Singapore 309021 / SG
02 / EVERS, Inge
Dr. Dreeslaan 218
NL-4241 CM Arkel / NL
03 / PUTKER, Johannus, Josephus, Maria
Schellinglaan 16
NL-2271 VE Voorburg / NL
04 / TERLOUW, Bastiaan
Kortgerecht 62
NL-4145 NM Schoonrewoerd / NL
[2000/01]
Representative(s)van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
NL-2502 LS The Hague / NL
[N/P]
Former [2008/22]van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al
Postbus 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
Former [2003/16]van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
Former [2000/01]de Bruijn, Leendert C.
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date98902294.205.02.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998NL00072
Priority number, dateNL1997100520106.02.1997         Original published format: NL 1005201
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9834500
Date:13.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0967890
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0967890
Date:30.11.2005
Language:EN
[2005/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.08.1998
ClassificationIPC:A23L1/09, A23L1/236, A23G3/00, A23G9/02, A21D2/18
[2000/01]
CPC:
A23G3/346 (EP,US); A21D2/181 (EP,US); A23G9/52 (EP,US);
A23L27/34 (EP,US); A23L29/37 (EP,US); A23G2200/06 (EP,US)
C-Set:
A23G3/346, A23G2200/06 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/01]
TitleGerman:FLÜSSIGE TRANSPARENTE MISCHUNG AUF BASIS VON LAKTITOL[2000/01]
English:LIQUID, TRANSPARENT MIXTURE BASED ON LACTITOL[2000/01]
French:MELANGE LIQUIDE TRANSPARENT A BASE DE LACTITOL[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase22.07.1999National basic fee paid 
22.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
22.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
06.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.10.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.05.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.09.2005Fee for grant paid
27.09.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.08.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
19.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
07.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
10.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
31.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
29.02.200003   M06   Fee paid on   10.08.2000
28.02.200205   M06   Fee paid on   19.07.2002
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT30.11.2005
CH30.11.2005
IT30.11.2005
LI30.11.2005
IE06.02.2006
PT02.05.2006
[2008/15]
Former [2007/17]AT30.11.2005
CH30.11.2005
LI30.11.2005
IE06.02.2006
PT02.05.2006
Former [2006/49]AT30.11.2005
CH30.11.2005
LI30.11.2005
PT02.05.2006
Former [2006/34]AT30.11.2005
CH30.11.2005
LI30.11.2005
Former [2006/33]CH30.11.2005
LI30.11.2005
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9206943  (XYROFIN OY [FI]) [A] 1-9* claim - *;
 [A]DE4411582  (WORLEE SWEET E H WORLEE & CO G [DE]) [A] 1-9 * claim - *;
 [XD]WO9526644  (WORLEE SWEET E H WORLEE & CO G [DE], et al) [XD] 1-9 * page 2, lines 1-7 * * page 2, line 28 - page 3, line 19 * * page 4, line 17 - page 5, line 4; claim - *;
 [A]US5527554  (OLINGER PHILIP M [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * claim - *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.