EP1016194 - ROTATING ELECTRIC MACHINE AND A BRACING DEVICE FOR SUCH A MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.04.2006 [2006/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB AB 721 83 Västerås / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/27] | For all designated states ABB AB 721 83 Västeras / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINDGREN, Klas Geijersgatan 11 A S-723 35 Västeras / SE | 02 /
LEIJON, Mats Hyvlargatan 5 S-723 35 Västeras / SE | 03 /
GÖRAN, Bengt Vales väg 13 S-723 55 Västeras / SE | 04 /
TRÄSKMAN, Olle Stora gatan 69 S-724 60 Västeras / SE | [2000/27] | Representative(s) | Johansson Webjörn, Ingmari L.A. Groth & Co KB Patentbyra P.O. Box 6107 102 32 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/27] | Johansson Webjörn, Ingmari L.A. Groth & Co KB Patentbyra, P.O. Box 6107 102 32 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 98902376.7 | 02.02.1998 | [2000/27] | WO1998SE00179 | Priority number, date | SE19970000368 | 03.02.1997 Original published format: SE 9700368 | SE19970004432 | 28.11.1997 Original published format: SE 9704432 | [2000/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9834327 | Date: | 06.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1016194 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 06.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H02K3/50, H02K3/40, H02K3/30 | [2000/27] | CPC: |
H02K3/50 (EP,KR);
H02K2203/15 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/27] | Title | German: | ROTIERENDE ELEKTRISCHE MASCHINE UND VERSPANNEINRICHTUNG FÜR EINE SOLCHE MASCHINE | [2000/27] | English: | ROTATING ELECTRIC MACHINE AND A BRACING DEVICE FOR SUCH A MACHINE | [2000/27] | French: | MACHINE TOURNANTE ELECTRIQUE ET DISPOSITIF DE RETENUE POUR UNE TELLE MACHINE | [2000/27] | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 03.09.1999 | Examination requested [2000/27] | 01.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/15] | 10.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2005 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5355046 (WEIGELT KLAUS [DE]); | [A]US5036165 (ELTON RICHARD K [US], et al); | [A]US4510077 (ELTON RICHARD K [US]); | [A]US5468916 (LITENAS MICHAEL [DE], et al); | [A]WO9406194 (ELIN ENERGIEVERSORGUNG [AT], et al); | [A]US4238339 (FRIDMAN VLADIMIR M [SU], et al); | [A]US4488079 (DAILEY GEORGE F [US], et al) |