EP0985183 - SYSTEM AND METHODS FOR GENERATING DIGITAL MULTIMEDIA STORE DISPLAYS AND MENU BOARDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/11] | SYSTEMS, METHODS AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCTS FOR GENERATING DIGITAL MULTIMEDIA STORE DISPLAYS AND MENU BOARDS | ||
[2001/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Frankel & Company 111 east Wacker Drive Chicago, IL 60601 / US | [2000/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANDEBERG, Richard, D. 2601 West Coyle Avenue Chicago, IL 60645 / US | 02 /
MOLESKI, Desmond, C., J. 10 W. Chestnut No. 3 Chicago, IL 60610 / US | 03 /
ALMAGRO, Manolo, B. 850 N. State Street Chicago, IL 60610 / US | 04 /
MEYER, Joseph, F. 5425 North Pennsylvania Street Indianapolis, IN 46220 / US | [2002/01] |
Former [2000/11] | 01 /
MANDEBERG, Richard, D. 2601 West Coyle Avenue Chicago, IL 60645 / US | ||
02 /
MOLESKI, Desmond, C., J. 10 W. Chestnut No. 3 Chicago, IL 60610 / US | |||
03 /
ALMAGRO, Manolo, B. 850 N. State Street Chicago, IL 60610 / US | |||
04 /
MEYER, Joseph, F. 5425 North Pennsylvania Street Indianopolis, IN 46220 / US | Representative(s) | Naismith, Robert Stewart, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/11] | Naismith, Robert Stewart, et al CRUIKSHANK & FAIRWEATHER 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow, G1 3AE Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 98902487.2 | 13.01.1998 | [2000/11] | WO1998US00513 | Priority number, date | US19970819419 | 17.03.1997 Original published format: US 819419 | [2000/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9841936 | Date: | 24.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0985183 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0985183 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2000/11] | CPC: |
G06Q50/12 (EP,US);
G06F16/532 (EP,US);
H04N7/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/11] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM GENERIEREN VON DIGITALEN MULTIMEDIALEN GROSSBILDSCHIRMEN UND AUSSTELLUNGSANZEIGEN IN LÄDEN | [2001/14] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHODS FOR GENERATING DIGITAL MULTIMEDIA STORE DISPLAYS AND MENU BOARDS | [2001/14] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDES DE GENERATION, SUR SUPPORT NUMERIQUE MULTIMEDIA, D'ETALAGES EN MAGASINS ET DE CARTES DE MENUS | [2001/14] |
Former [2000/11] | SYSTEME, VERFAHREN UND COMPUTERPROGRAMME ZUM GENERIEREN VON DIGITALEN MULTIMEDIALEN GROSSBILDSCHIRMEN UND AUSSTELLUNGSANZEIGEN IN LÄDEN | ||
Former [2000/11] | SYSTEMS, METHODS AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCTS FOR GENERATING DIGITAL MULTIMEDIA STORE DISPLAYS AND MENU BOARDS | ||
Former [2000/11] | SYSTEMES, PROCEDES ET PROGICIELS DE GENERATION, SUR SUPPORT NUMERIQUE MULTIMEDIA, D'ETALAGES EN MAGASINS ET DE CARTES DE MENUS | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/11] | 18.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.04.2002 | BE | 24.04.2002 | CH | 24.04.2002 | FI | 24.04.2002 | FR | 24.04.2002 | GR | 24.04.2002 | IT | 24.04.2002 | LI | 24.04.2002 | NL | 24.04.2002 | DK | 24.07.2002 | PT | 24.07.2002 | SE | 24.07.2002 | DE | 25.07.2002 | ES | 30.10.2002 | GB | 13.01.2003 | IE | 13.01.2003 | LU | 13.01.2003 | [2008/15] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 24.04.2002 | |
BE | 24.04.2002 | ||
CH | 24.04.2002 | ||
FI | 24.04.2002 | ||
FR | 24.04.2002 | ||
GR | 24.04.2002 | ||
LI | 24.04.2002 | ||
NL | 24.04.2002 | ||
DK | 24.07.2002 | ||
PT | 24.07.2002 | ||
SE | 24.07.2002 | ||
DE | 25.07.2002 | ||
ES | 30.10.2002 | ||
GB | 13.01.2003 | ||
IE | 13.01.2003 | ||
LU | 13.01.2003 | ||
Former [2004/40] | AT | 24.04.2002 | |
BE | 24.04.2002 | ||
CH | 24.04.2002 | ||
FI | 24.04.2002 | ||
GR | 24.04.2002 | ||
LI | 24.04.2002 | ||
NL | 24.04.2002 | ||
DK | 24.07.2002 | ||
PT | 24.07.2002 | ||
SE | 24.07.2002 | ||
DE | 25.07.2002 | ||
ES | 30.10.2002 | ||
FR | 10.01.2003 | ||
GB | 13.01.2003 | ||
IE | 13.01.2003 | ||
LU | 13.01.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 24.04.2002 | |
BE | 24.04.2002 | ||
CH | 24.04.2002 | ||
GR | 24.04.2002 | ||
LI | 24.04.2002 | ||
NL | 24.04.2002 | ||
DK | 24.07.2002 | ||
PT | 24.07.2002 | ||
SE | 24.07.2002 | ||
DE | 25.07.2002 | ||
ES | 30.10.2002 | ||
FR | 10.01.2003 | ||
GB | 13.01.2003 | ||
IE | 13.01.2003 | ||
LU | 13.01.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | AT | 24.04.2002 | |
BE | 24.04.2002 | ||
CH | 24.04.2002 | ||
GR | 24.04.2002 | ||
LI | 24.04.2002 | ||
NL | 24.04.2002 | ||
DK | 24.07.2002 | ||
PT | 24.07.2002 | ||
SE | 24.07.2002 | ||
DE | 25.07.2002 | ||
ES | 30.10.2002 | ||
FR | 10.01.2003 | ||
GB | 13.01.2003 | ||
IE | 13.01.2003 | ||
Former [2004/15] | AT | 24.04.2002 | |
BE | 24.04.2002 | ||
CH | 24.04.2002 | ||
GR | 24.04.2002 | ||
LI | 24.04.2002 | ||
NL | 24.04.2002 | ||
DK | 24.07.2002 | ||
PT | 24.07.2002 | ||
SE | 24.07.2002 | ||
DE | 25.07.2002 | ||
ES | 30.10.2002 | ||
FR | 10.01.2003 | ||
IE | 13.01.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 24.04.2002 | |
BE | 24.04.2002 | ||
CH | 24.04.2002 | ||
GR | 24.04.2002 | ||
LI | 24.04.2002 | ||
NL | 24.04.2002 | ||
DK | 24.07.2002 | ||
PT | 24.07.2002 | ||
SE | 24.07.2002 | ||
DE | 25.07.2002 | ||
ES | 30.10.2002 | ||
FR | 10.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/48] | AT | 24.04.2002 | |
BE | 24.04.2002 | ||
CH | 24.04.2002 | ||
GR | 24.04.2002 | ||
LI | 24.04.2002 | ||
NL | 24.04.2002 | ||
DK | 24.07.2002 | ||
PT | 24.07.2002 | ||
SE | 24.07.2002 | ||
DE | 25.07.2002 | ||
FR | 10.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | AT | 24.04.2002 | |
CH | 24.04.2002 | ||
GR | 24.04.2002 | ||
LI | 24.04.2002 | ||
NL | 24.04.2002 | ||
DK | 24.07.2002 | ||
PT | 24.07.2002 | ||
SE | 24.07.2002 | ||
DE | 25.07.2002 | ||
FR | 10.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 24.04.2002 | |
CH | 24.04.2002 | ||
GR | 24.04.2002 | ||
LI | 24.04.2002 | ||
NL | 24.04.2002 | ||
DK | 24.07.2002 | ||
PT | 24.07.2002 | ||
SE | 24.07.2002 | ||
DE | 25.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | AT | 24.04.2002 | |
CH | 24.04.2002 | ||
GR | 24.04.2002 | ||
LI | 24.04.2002 | ||
NL | 24.04.2002 | ||
PT | 24.07.2002 | ||
SE | 24.07.2002 | ||
DE | 25.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/21] | AT | 24.04.2002 | |
CH | 24.04.2002 | ||
GR | 24.04.2002 | ||
LI | 24.04.2002 | ||
NL | 24.04.2002 | ||
PT | 24.07.2002 | ||
SE | 24.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/19] | AT | 24.04.2002 | |
CH | 24.04.2002 | ||
GR | 24.04.2002 | ||
LI | 24.04.2002 | ||
NL | 24.04.2002 | ||
SE | 24.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/16] | AT | 24.04.2002 | |
CH | 24.04.2002 | ||
LI | 24.04.2002 | ||
NL | 24.04.2002 | ||
SE | 24.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/10] | AT | 24.04.2002 | |
NL | 24.04.2002 | ||
SE | 24.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | NL | 24.04.2002 | |
SE | 24.07.2002 | ||
Former [2002/42] | SE | 24.07.2002 | Cited in | International search | [Y]FR2596605 (VANDAMME JACQUES [FR]) [Y] 1-67 * page 5, line 14 - page 6, line 37 ** page 8, line 19 - page 8, line 29 *; | [YD]WO9608113 (BYLON CO LTD [GB], et al) [YD] 1-67 * claims 18-27 * * page 4, line 1 - line 13 * * page 5, line 3 - line 11 * * page 7, line 26 - line 36 * * page 15, line 20 - page 17, line 30 * |