EP0954834 - PAGER-BASED CONTROLLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2002 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 05.01.2005 [2005/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gelbien, Lawrence 41 Alice Road West Islip, NY 11795 / US | [1999/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/45] | Representative(s) | Olsson, Jan, et al Bjerkéns Patentbyrå KB P.O.Box 1274 801 37 Gävle / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/45] | Olsson, Jan, et al Bjerkéns Patentbyra KB P.O.Box 1274 801 37 Gävle / SE | Application number, filing date | 98902652.1 | 21.01.1998 | [1999/45] | WO1998US01096 | Priority number, date | US19970036275P | 24.01.1997 Original published format: US 36275 P | [1999/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9833153 | Date: | 30.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0954834 | Date: | 10.11.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0954834 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G08B5/22 | [1999/45] | CPC: |
G08B5/228 (EP,US);
G08C17/02 (EP,US);
G08C2201/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/45] | Title | German: | AUF PERSONENFUNKRUFEMPFÄNGER BASIERENDE STEUERVORRICHTUNG | [1999/45] | English: | PAGER-BASED CONTROLLER | [1999/45] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE RELIE A UN APPAREIL DE RECHERCHE DE PERSONNE | [1999/45] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/45] | 16.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2001 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   09.07.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.10.2001 | CH | 31.10.2001 | FI | 31.10.2001 | LI | 31.10.2001 | NL | 31.10.2001 | LU | 21.01.2002 | DK | 31.01.2002 | PT | 31.01.2002 | SE | 31.01.2002 | GR | 01.02.2002 | ES | 30.04.2002 | [2005/01] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 31.10.2001 | |
CH | 31.10.2001 | ||
FI | 31.10.2001 | ||
LI | 31.10.2001 | ||
NL | 31.10.2001 | ||
LU | 21.01.2002 | ||
DK | 31.01.2002 | ||
PT | 31.01.2002 | ||
SE | 31.01.2002 | ||
ES | 30.04.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 31.10.2001 | |
CH | 31.10.2001 | ||
FI | 31.10.2001 | ||
LI | 31.10.2001 | ||
NL | 31.10.2001 | ||
DK | 31.01.2002 | ||
PT | 31.01.2002 | ||
SE | 31.01.2002 | ||
ES | 30.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 31.10.2001 | |
CH | 31.10.2001 | ||
FI | 31.10.2001 | ||
LI | 31.10.2001 | ||
NL | 31.10.2001 | ||
DK | 31.01.2002 | ||
PT | 31.01.2002 | ||
SE | 31.01.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 31.10.2001 | |
CH | 31.10.2001 | ||
FI | 31.10.2001 | ||
LI | 31.10.2001 | ||
NL | 31.10.2001 | ||
PT | 31.01.2002 | ||
SE | 31.01.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | CH | 31.10.2001 | |
FI | 31.10.2001 | ||
LI | 31.10.2001 | ||
PT | 31.01.2002 | ||
SE | 31.01.2002 | ||
Former [2002/48] | FI | 31.10.2001 | |
PT | 31.01.2002 | ||
SE | 31.01.2002 | ||
Former [2002/33] | FI | 31.10.2001 | |
SE | 31.01.2002 | ||
Former [2002/27] | SE | 31.01.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0716553 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1* abstract * |