EP1057171 - AUDIO RECORDER WITH RETROACTIVE STORAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.01.2007 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.02.2007 [2007/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YUEN, Henry C. P.O. Box 1159 Redondo Beach, CA 90278 / US | For all designated states Yuen, Philip P. P.O. Box 1159 Redondo Beach, CA 90278 / US | [2000/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/49] | Representative(s) | MacDougall, Donald Carmichael, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/49] | MacDougall, Donald Carmichael, et al Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE, Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 98902702.4 | 22.01.1998 | [2000/49] | WO1998US01337 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9938154 | Date: | 29.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1057171 | Date: | 06.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.07.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G10L3/00 | [2000/49] | CPC: |
G11C7/16 (EP);
G11B20/00007 (EP);
G11B20/10527 (EP);
G11C2207/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/49] | Title | German: | AUDIORECORDER MIT RÜCKGEKOPPELTEM SPEICHER | [2000/49] | English: | AUDIO RECORDER WITH RETROACTIVE STORAGE | [2000/49] | French: | ENREGISTREUR AUDIO AVEC MISE EN MEMOIRE RETROACTIVE | [2000/49] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2000 | Search fee paid | 16.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/49] | 01.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/07] | 13.09.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2005 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   14.02.2005 | 31.01.2006 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0457373 (PICOTRIN TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [A] 15-20* the whole document *; | [X]US5687279 (MATTHEWS WALTER S [US]) [X] 1-20 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US5014317 (KITA KAZUNORI [JP], et al); | [X]US4318188 (HOFFMANN KURT); | [X]US4698776 (SHIBATA IZUMI [JP]); | [X]US4989179 (SIMKO RICHARD T [US]) | [X] - STIFELMAN LISA JOY, "VoiceNotes: An Application for a Voice-Controlled Hand-Held Computer", MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY, June 1992, pages 24-29 and 71-84 and 118-120. |