EP0975811 - SIMULATED MOVING BED BLOCK DISPLACEMENT PROCEDURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amalgamated Research, Inc. 2531 Orchard Drive East Twin Falls, ID 83301 / US | [2010/01] |
Former [2000/05] | For all designated states AMALGAMATED RESEARCH, INC 2531 ORCHARD DRIVE E. TWIN FALLS, ID 83301 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KEARNEY, Michael, M. 2151 Woodriver Circle Twin Falls, ID 83301 / US | 02 /
PETERSON, Kenneth, R. 1519 Princeton Drive Twin Falls, ID 83301 / US | 03 /
MUMM, Michael, W. 3798 North 3850 East Hansen, ID 83334 / US | [2000/05] | Representative(s) | Gerbino, Angelo, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/05] | Gerbino, Angelo, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 98902769.3 | 06.01.1998 | [2000/05] | WO1998US00115 | Priority number, date | US19970034191 | 07.01.1997 Original published format: US 34191 | [2000/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9830724 | Date: | 16.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0975811 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0975811 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.07.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C13D3/14, C13J1/06, B01D15/00, B01D15/08, G01N30/88, C13K3/00 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
C13B35/06 (EP,US);
B01D15/185 (EP,US);
C13B20/14 (EP,US);
B01D2215/023 (EP,US);
B01D2215/024 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/05] | C13D3/14, C13J1/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [2000/05] | Title | German: | BLOCKVERSCHIEBUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EIN SIMULIERTES WANDERBETT | [2000/05] | English: | SIMULATED MOVING BED BLOCK DISPLACEMENT PROCEDURE | [2000/05] | French: | PROCEDURE DE DEPLACEMENT D'UN BLOC DANS UN LIT MOBILE SIMULE | [2000/05] | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.1999 | Search fee paid | 05.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 05.08.1999 | Examination requested [2000/05] | 11.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 19.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/49] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 19.10.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 19.10.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 01.12.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 01.12.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.01.2009 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH07323203 ; | [A]US2985589 (BROUGHTON DONALD B, et al) [A] 1-7* figure 1; claim - *; | [Y]US3268605 (BOYD JR DAVID M) [Y] 1 * column 5, line 56 - column 6; figure 2; claims 1-7 * * column 11, line 46 - column 13, line 46; figure 4 * * column 13, line 66 - column 14, line 33; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0342629 (RYOKA TECHNO ENGINEERING & CON [JP]) [Y] 1-7 * figure - *; | [Y]US5102553 (KEARNEY MICHAEL M [US], et al) [Y] 1-7 * column 3, lines 30-63; figures 1,2; example -; claims 1,12 * * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 18 *; | [Y]US5198120 (MASUDA TAKAYUKI [US], et al) [Y] 1-7 * claim -; tables 8,9 *; | [Y]US5223143 (MASUDA TAKAYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-7 * column 10, lines 49-64; figure .; example - *; | [Y]EP0577079 (DAICEL CHEM [JP]) [Y] 1-7 * figure 2; claim - *; | [Y]FR2694208 (SEPAREX SA [FR]) [Y] 1-7 * page 18, line 14 - page 19, line 15; figure 6 *; | [A]US5391299 (MASUDA TAKAYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US5422007 (NICOUD ROGER [FR], et al) [A] 1-7 * figure 5 *; | [Y]WO9610650 (CULTOR OY [FI], et al) [Y] 1-7 * figures 1,4-8 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960430), vol. 1996, no. 04, & JP07323203 A 19951212 (DAICEL CHEM IND LTD) [A] 1-7 * abstract * | International search | [A]US4359430 (HEIKKILAE HEIKKI O, et al); | [A]US4412866 (SCHOENROCK KARLHEINZ W R [US], et al); | [A]US5127957 (HEIKKILA HEIKKI [FI], et al) | by applicant | US5102553 | US5198120 | US5223143 | WO9610650 |