EP0963478 - CARBAMATE MODIFIED LOW-MOLECULAR POLYMER COMPOUND AND THE USE THEREOF FOR AFTER-TREATMENT OF DYED OR PRINTED CELLULOSE TEXTILE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.01.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.03.2003 [2003/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEXTIL COLOR AG Schildstrasse 9475 Sevelen / CH | [1999/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLZDÖRFER, Uwe, Daniel Am Baggastiel 58 CH-9475 Sevelen / CH | 02 /
HAID, Martin Guschastrasse 19 CH-9475 Sevelen / CH | 03 /
BRAUN, Rainer Steinrietbünt 5 CH-9475 Sevelen / CH | 04 /
SOWOIDNICH, Werner Hostetgasse 24 CH-9470 Buchs / CH | 05 /
TORESAN, Viktor Chalberweidstrasse 26 CH-9475 Sevelen / CH | [1999/50] | Representative(s) | Hasler, Erich, et al c/o Riederer Hasler & Partner Patentanwälte AG Elestastrasse 8 7310 Bad Ragaz / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1999/50] | Hasler, Erich, Dr., et al c/o Riederer Hasler & Partner, Patentanwälte AG, Bahnhofstrasse 10 7310 Bad Ragaz / CH | Application number, filing date | 98902922.8 | 23.02.1998 | [1999/50] | WO1998CH00071 | Priority number, date | CH19970000440 | 26.02.1997 Original published format: CH 44097 | [1999/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9838378 | Date: | 03.09.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0963478 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | D06P5/06, D06P5/08, C08G73/02, C08G73/00, C07C279/26 | [1999/50] | CPC: |
D06P1/5285 (EP);
C08G73/00 (EP);
C08G73/02 (EP);
C08G73/0233 (EP);
D06P5/06 (EP);
D06P5/08 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1999/50] | Title | German: | CARBAMAT MODIFIZIERTE NIEDERMOLEKULARE POLYMERE VERBINDUNG UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ZUR NACHBEHANDLUNG VON GEFÄRBTEM ODER BEDRUCKTEM CELLULOSE TEXTILMATERIAL | [1999/50] | English: | CARBAMATE MODIFIED LOW-MOLECULAR POLYMER COMPOUND AND THE USE THEREOF FOR AFTER-TREATMENT OF DYED OR PRINTED CELLULOSE TEXTILE MATERIAL | [1999/50] | French: | COMPOSE POLYMERE A FAIBLE POIDS MOLECULAIRE, MODIFIE AVEC DU CARBAMATE, ET SON UTILISATION POUR LE TRAITEMENT ULTERIEUR DE MATERIAU TEXTILE A BASE DE CELLULOSE, TEINT OU IMPRIME | [1999/50] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/50] | 18.09.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 26.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/11] | 07.10.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   19.05.2000 | 28.02.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1109696 (CHEMIRAD CORPORATION) [A] 1-23 * page 1, line 59 - line 70 * * page 2, column 1, line 35 - line 41; claim - *; | [A]GB722321 (CIBA LIMITED) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2084894 (SANDOZ SA) [A] 1-23 * claim - *; | [A]FR1347612 (FARBENFABRIKEN BAYER AG.) [A] 1-23 * page 1 - page 2 *; | [A]GB2006279 (BAYER AG) [A] 1-23 * page 2, column 1, line 21 - line 29; claim - *; | [DA]DE3330120 (SANDOZ AG) [DA] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [A]CH662919 (SANDOZ AG.) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [D]WO8102423 (SANDOZ AG) |