EP0951805 - COOKTOP WITH A NON-METALLIC HOTPLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.2003 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
SE
Schott Glas Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | For:GB
CARL-ZEISS-STIFTUNG trading as SCHOTT GLAS Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/48] | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
SE
Schott Glas Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | ||
For:GB
CARL-ZEISS-STIFTUNG trading as SCHOTT GLAS Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | |||
Former [1999/43] | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
SE
Schott Glas Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | ||
For:GB
CARL-ZEISS-STIFTUNG trading as SCHOTT GLASWERKE Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BORRMANN, Andreas In der Dörrwies 32b D-55218 Ingelheim / DE | 02 /
MUNKES, Dieter Cramerstrasse 51 D-55450 Langenlonsheim / DE | 03 /
SCHAUPERT, Kurt Rüdesheimer Strasse 46 D-65719 Hofheim / DE | 04 /
ENGELMANN, Harry Im Simmerling 54 D-55411 Bingen / DE | [1999/43] | Representative(s) | Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Fuchs Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1999/43] | Fuchs Mehler Weiss & Fritzsche Patentanwälte Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 7 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 98903007.7 | 07.01.1998 | [1999/43] | WO1998EP00194 | Priority number, date | DE1997100753 | 11.01.1997 Original published format: DE 19700753 | [1999/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9831198 | Date: | 16.07.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0951805 | Date: | 27.10.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0951805 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H05B3/74, H05B3/68, G01V3/10 | [1999/43] | CPC: |
F24C15/106 (EP,US);
H05B3/746 (EP,US);
H05B2213/05 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1999/43] | Title | German: | KOCHFELD MIT EINER NICHTMETALLISCHEN KOCHPLATTE | [1999/43] | English: | COOKTOP WITH A NON-METALLIC HOTPLATE | [1999/43] | French: | SURFACE DE CUISSON AVEC UN SERPENTIN NON METALLIQUE | [1999/43] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.1999 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/43] | 25.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.03.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS56116142 ; | [Y]US3763424 (WILHELMSEN H, et al) [Y] 1-3,5,6,8,10 * abstract *; | [A]DE2831858 (LICENTIA GMBH); | [YD]DE3733108 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE) [YD] 1-3,5,6,8,10 * column 3 - column 4; figures 2,3B *; | [A]EP0485190 (GEC FERRANTI DEFENCE SYST [GB]) [A] 7 * abstract *; | [A]US5352864 (SCHULTHEIS BERND [DE], et al) [A] 4,11 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19811205), vol. 005, no. 191, Database accession no. (P - 092), & JP56116142 A 19810911 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 7 * abstract * |