EP1022987 - SUTURED STAPLE SURGICAL FASTENERS, INSTRUMENTS AND METHODS FOR MINIMALLY INVASIVE VASCULAR AND ENDOSCOPIC SURGERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2002 [2002/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coalescent Surgical, Inc. 559 East Weddell Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [2000/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARDINER, Barry, N. 13 Charles Hill Road Orinda, CA 94563 / US | 02 /
McDONALD, Paul, T. 13337 Campus Drive Oakland, CA 94619 / US | 03 /
PHIPPS, Richard, D. 790 LaCrosse Drive Morgan Hill, CA 95037 / US | [2000/31] | Representative(s) | Price, Nigel John King J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/31] | Price, Nigel John King J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 98903430.1 | 07.01.1998 | [2000/31] | WO1998US00462 | Priority number, date | US19970781579 | 09.01.1997 Original published format: US 781579 | [2000/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9830152 | Date: | 16.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1022987 | Date: | 02.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/04 | [2000/31] | CPC: |
A61B17/068 (EP,US);
A61B17/0625 (EP,US);
A61B17/064 (EP,US);
A61B17/0644 (EP,US);
A61B17/11 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0647 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/31] | Title | German: | CHIRURGISCHE BEFESTIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG MITTELS NAHT-KLAMMERN, SO WIE INSTRUMENT UND VERFAHREN ZUR MINIMAL-INVASIVEN VASKULÄREN UND ENDOSKOPISCHEN CHIRURGIE | [2000/31] | English: | SUTURED STAPLE SURGICAL FASTENERS, INSTRUMENTS AND METHODS FOR MINIMALLY INVASIVE VASCULAR AND ENDOSCOPIC SURGERY | [2000/31] | French: | ATTACHES CHIRURGICALES SOUS FORME D'AGRAFES DE SUTURE, INSTRUMENTS ET PROCEDES ASSOCIES POUR CHIRURGIE ENDOSCOPIQUE OU VASCULAIRE A EFFRACTION MINIMALE | [2000/31] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.1999 | Search fee paid | 27.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.07.1999 | Examination requested [2000/31] | 31.01.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/18] | 05.11.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2001 | 04   M06   Not yet paid | 31.01.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5417700 (EGAN THOMAS D [US]); | [Y]US5431666 (SAUER JUDE S [US], et al) |