EP0967957 - PERSONAL CLEANSING COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2004 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/37] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | ||
Former [2000/01] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WELLS, Robert, Lee 4245 Rose Hill Avenue Cincinnati, OH 45229 / US | [2000/01] | Representative(s) | McKinney, Victoria, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centers Limited Lovett House Lovett Road Staines, Middlesex TW18 3AZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | McKinney, Victoria, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centers Limited Lovett House, Lovett Road Staines, Middlesex TW18 3AZ / GB | ||
Former [2000/01] | Woof, Victoria, et al Procter & Gamble (Health & Beauty Care) Limited, Lovett House, Lovett Road Staines, Middlesex TW18 3AZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98903609.0 | 21.01.1998 | [2000/01] | WO1998US01097 | Priority number, date | US19970786578 | 21.01.1997 Original published format: US 786578 | [2000/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9831327 | Date: | 23.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0967957 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0967957 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/00 | [2000/01] | CPC: |
A61Q19/10 (EP,US);
A61K8/06 (EP,US);
A61K8/442 (EP,US);
A61K8/463 (EP,US);
A61K8/466 (EP,US);
A61K8/731 (EP,US);
A61K8/737 (EP,US);
A61K8/8117 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61Q5/02 (EP,US);
A61K2800/5422 (EP,US);
A61K2800/5424 (EP,US);
A61Q5/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/01] | Title | German: | KÖRPERREINIGUNGSMITTEL | [2000/01] | English: | PERSONAL CLEANSING COMPOSITIONS | [2000/01] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE NETTOYAGE POUR SOINS PERSONNELS | [2000/01] | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.07.1999 | Examination requested [2000/01] | 20.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.09.2003 | BE | 10.09.2003 | CH | 10.09.2003 | FI | 10.09.2003 | IT | 10.09.2003 | LI | 10.09.2003 | NL | 10.09.2003 | DK | 10.12.2003 | GR | 10.12.2003 | SE | 10.12.2003 | PT | 18.12.2003 | ES | 21.12.2003 | IE | 21.01.2004 | LU | 21.01.2004 | [2008/15] |
Former [2005/23] | AT | 10.09.2003 | |
BE | 10.09.2003 | ||
CH | 10.09.2003 | ||
FI | 10.09.2003 | ||
LI | 10.09.2003 | ||
NL | 10.09.2003 | ||
DK | 10.12.2003 | ||
GR | 10.12.2003 | ||
SE | 10.12.2003 | ||
PT | 18.12.2003 | ||
ES | 21.12.2003 | ||
IE | 21.01.2004 | ||
LU | 21.01.2004 | ||
Former [2005/03] | AT | 10.09.2003 | |
BE | 10.09.2003 | ||
CH | 10.09.2003 | ||
FI | 10.09.2003 | ||
LI | 10.09.2003 | ||
NL | 10.09.2003 | ||
DK | 10.12.2003 | ||
GR | 10.12.2003 | ||
SE | 10.12.2003 | ||
PT | 18.12.2003 | ||
ES | 21.12.2003 | ||
IE | 21.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | AT | 10.09.2003 | |
BE | 10.09.2003 | ||
CH | 10.09.2003 | ||
FI | 10.09.2003 | ||
LI | 10.09.2003 | ||
NL | 10.09.2003 | ||
DK | 10.12.2003 | ||
GR | 10.12.2003 | ||
SE | 10.12.2003 | ||
PT | 18.12.2003 | ||
ES | 21.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/41] | AT | 10.09.2003 | |
BE | 10.09.2003 | ||
CH | 10.09.2003 | ||
FI | 10.09.2003 | ||
LI | 10.09.2003 | ||
NL | 10.09.2003 | ||
DK | 10.12.2003 | ||
GR | 10.12.2003 | ||
SE | 10.12.2003 | ||
PT | 18.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 10.09.2003 | |
BE | 10.09.2003 | ||
CH | 10.09.2003 | ||
FI | 10.09.2003 | ||
LI | 10.09.2003 | ||
NL | 10.09.2003 | ||
GR | 10.12.2003 | ||
SE | 10.12.2003 | ||
PT | 18.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 10.09.2003 | |
BE | 10.09.2003 | ||
CH | 10.09.2003 | ||
FI | 10.09.2003 | ||
LI | 10.09.2003 | ||
NL | 10.09.2003 | ||
GR | 10.12.2003 | ||
SE | 10.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | AT | 10.09.2003 | |
CH | 10.09.2003 | ||
FI | 10.09.2003 | ||
LI | 10.09.2003 | ||
NL | 10.09.2003 | ||
GR | 10.12.2003 | ||
SE | 10.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/16] | AT | 10.09.2003 | |
FI | 10.09.2003 | ||
NL | 10.09.2003 | ||
GR | 10.12.2003 | ||
SE | 10.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | AT | 10.09.2003 | |
FI | 10.09.2003 | ||
NL | 10.09.2003 | ||
GR | 10.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | FI | 10.09.2003 | |
NL | 10.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/12] | FI | 10.09.2003 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0194097 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-3,9 * page 15; examples A-C *; | [X]EP0313302 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-4,9 * example 11 *; | [A]WO9109931 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1,9* the whole document *; | [X]EP0592073 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]) [X] 1-6,9,10 * examples 14,17-23 *; | [PX]WO9707782 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [PX] 1-7,9,10 * page 31; example - * |