EP0954457 - VEHICLE SEAT ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.10.2002 [2002/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOOVER UNIVERSAL, INC. 49200 Halyard Drive Plymouth Michigan 48170 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/45] | For all designated states HOOVER UNIVERSAL, INC. 49200 Halyard Drive Plymouth, Michigan 48170 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUTTON, Mark 38294 N. Williams Circle Westland, MI 48186 / US | 02 /
CANNELL, Donald, R. 1451 Appleford Walled Lake, MI 48390 / US | 03 /
PROSNIEWSKI, Joseph, F. 19675 Inkster Road Brownstown Twp., MI 48174 / US | 04 /
NANNAPANENI, Raghu 28700 Franklin River Drive 106 Southfield, MI 48034 / US | [1999/45] | Representative(s) | Dealtry, Brian, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/35] | Dealtry, Brian, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [1999/45] | Gilding, Martin John, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 98903617.3 | 14.01.1998 | [1999/45] | WO1998US01123 | Priority number, date | US19970787626 | 23.01.1997 Original published format: US 787626 | [1999/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9832629 | Date: | 30.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0954457 | Date: | 10.11.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0954457 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/36, B60N2/48 | [1999/45] | CPC: |
B60N2/3013 (EP,US);
B60N2/305 (EP,US);
B60N2/36 (EP,US);
B60N2/859 (EP,US);
B60N2/874 (EP,US);
B60N2002/948 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/45] | Title | German: | KRAFTFAHRZEUGSITZ | [1999/45] | English: | VEHICLE SEAT ASSEMBLY | [1999/45] | French: | ENSEMBLE SIEGE DE VEHICULE | [1999/45] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/45] | 05.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2001 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   10.05.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3929374 (HOGAN GERARD T, et al) [A] 1,5,7,10 * column A; figures 1,2 *; | [A]GB2069328 (VOLVO AB) [A] 1,2,4,7-9 * the whole document *; | [XA]DE3306188 (AUDI AG [DE]) [X] 1,6,7,9 * abstract * [A] 2,3; | [XA]FR2660260 (RENAULT [FR]) [X] 1,5,7,9,10 * abstract * [A] 2; | [AP]DE19641089 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [AP] 1-4,7-9* abstract *; | [XPA]US5681079 (ROBINSON DAVID LEE [US]) [XP] 1,3,6,7,9 * column A; figures 1A-1C,3,4 * [A] 2,5 |