blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0976226

EP0976226 - INTEGRATED MULTIPORT SWITCH HAVING SHARED MEDIA ACCESS CONTROL CIRCUITRY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.01.2005
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip21.01.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.03.2005  [2005/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC.
One AMD Place Mail Stop 68 P.O. Box 3453
Sunnyvale CA 94088-3453 / US
[N/P]
Former [2004/12]For all designated states
ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC.
One AMD Place, Mail Stop 68
Sunnyvale, California 94088-3453 / US
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC.
One AMD Place, Mail Stop 68
Sunnyvale, California 94088-3453 / US
Inventor(s)01 / RUNALDUE, Thomas, Jefferson
3701 Blackford Avenue
San Jose, CA 95117 / US
02 / CHOW, Peter, Ka-Fai
1416 Maxwell Way
San Jose, CA 95131 / US
03 / VISWANATH, Somnath
655 South Fair Oaks Avenue H112
Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Picker, Madeline Margaret, et al
Brookes Batchellor
1 Boyne Park
Tunbridge Wells
Kent TN4 8EL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Picker, Madeline Margaret, et al
Brookes & Martin, High Holborn House, 52/54 High Holborn
London WC1V 6SE / GB
Application number, filing date98903831.029.01.1998
[2000/05]
WO1998US01760
Priority number, dateUS19970038025P14.02.1997         Original published format: US 38025 P
US1997099292118.12.1997         Original published format: US 992921
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9836535
Date:20.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0976226
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0976226
Date:17.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.08.1998
ClassificationIPC:H04L12/44
[2000/05]
CPC:
H04L41/0213 (EP,US); G06F12/128 (EP,US); G06F5/06 (EP,US);
G11C11/412 (EP,US); G11C7/1015 (EP,US); H04L49/3054 (EP,US);
H04L69/26 (EP,US); H04Q3/54591 (EP,US); H04L49/103 (EP,US);
H04L49/30 (EP,US); H04L49/351 (EP,US); H04L49/354 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/1316 (EP,US); H04Q2213/13162 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2000/05]
TitleGerman:INTEGRIERTE MULTIPORT-VERMITTLUNG MIT GETEILTER MEDIUMZUGRIFFSSTEUERUNGSSCHALTUNG[2000/05]
English:INTEGRATED MULTIPORT SWITCH HAVING SHARED MEDIA ACCESS CONTROL CIRCUITRY[2000/05]
French:COMMUTATEUR MULTI-PORT INTEGRE A CIRCUITS DE CONTROLE D'ACCES SUPPORTS PARTAGE[2000/05]
Entry into regional phase27.08.1999National basic fee paid 
27.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
27.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.06.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
29.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.11.2003Fee for grant paid
27.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.12.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
05.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
10.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
09.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
05.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[XAY]EP0603443  (IBM [US]) [X] 1,2 * page 2, line 1 - page 4, line 4 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 4,5 [Y] 3;
 [XAY]EP0603444  (IBM [US]) [X] 1,2 * page 2, line 1 - page 4, line 15 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 4,5 [Y] 3;
 [A]WO9118462  (UNIV TORONTO [CA]) [A] 1-5 * page 1, line 3 - page 4, line 22 * * page 15, line 19 - page 17, line 2 * * figure 5 *;
 [A]EP0656711  (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC [US]) [A] 1-5,11-16 * page 2, line 1 - line 35 * * page 7, line 39 - line 44 *;
 [A]US5467351  (BAUMERT ROBERT J [US]) [A] 11-16 * abstract * * column 1, line 14 - column 2, line 47 * * column 3, line 17 - line 61 * * column 4, line 63 - column 7, line 62 * * column 8, line 40 - line 59 * * column 9, line 24 - line 47 * * figures 6,7 *
 [A]  - "REDUNDANT MEDIA CONTROL UNIT FOR AN 802.4 TOKEN BUS", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, (19950501), vol. 38, no. 5, pages 423 - 425, XP000519632 [A] 1-5 * the whole document *
 [XAY]  - CLARK B, "EMERGING LAN STRUCTURES", WESCON '94. WESTERN ELECTRONIC SHOW AND CONVENTION, ANAHEIM, SEPT. 27 - 29, 1994, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19940927), pages 8 - 15, XP000532557 [X] 11,12,14,15 * abstract * * page 8, column R, line 17 - page 9, column R, line 4 * * page 11, column L * * page 12, column R * [A] 4,13,16 [Y] 3
 [XAY]  - BARILOVITS S ET AL, "100VG-ANYLAN: NETWORK OPERATION AND REAL-TIME CAPABILITIES", PROCEEDINGS OF THE CONFERENCE ON LOCAL COMPUTER NETWORKS, (19941002), pages 120 - 128, XP000618590 [X] 11,12,14,15 * page 122, column L, line 1 - column R, line 6 * [A] 4,13,16 [Y] 3
 [A]  - ALBRECHT A ET AL, "AN OVERVIEW OF IEEE 802.12 DEMAND PRIORITY", PROCEEDINGS OF THE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE (GLOBECOM), SAN FRANCISCO, NOV. 28 - DEC. 2, 1994, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19941128), VOL. 1, pages 263 - 268, XP000488555 [A] 11-16 * page 265, column R, line 4 - page 267, column L, line 11 *
 [A]  - WATSON G ET AL, "THE DEMAND PRIORITY MAC PROTOCOL", IEEE NETWORK: THE MAGAZINE OF COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS, (19950101), vol. 9, no. 1, pages 28 - 34, XP000486556 [A] 11-16 * page 28, column R, line 19 - page 30, column R, line 22 * * page 31, column L, line 1 - line 21 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/65.372617
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.