EP0956279 - PROCESS FOR THE ESTERIFICATION OF (METH)ACRYLIC ACID WITH AN ALKANOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.08.2002 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [2002/35] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [1999/46] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AICHINGER, Heinrich Hans-Sachs-Ring 16 D-68199 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
FRIED, Michael Handschuhsheimer Landstrasse 64 D-69121 Heidelberg / DE | 03 /
NESTLER, Gerhard Mundenheimer Strasse 170 D-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | 04 /
HERBST, Holger Radolfstrasse 7a D-67227 Frankenthal / DE | [1999/46] | Application number, filing date | 98904042.3 | 08.01.1998 | [1999/46] | WO1998EP00068 | Priority number, date | DE1997101737 | 20.01.1997 Original published format: DE 19701737 | [1999/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9831656 | Date: | 23.07.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0956279 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07C67/60, C07C67/08, C07C67/327, C07C69/54 | [1999/46] | CPC: |
C07C67/327 (EP,US);
C07C67/60 (EP,KR,US);
C07C67/08 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C67/08, C07C69/54 (EP,US);
C07C67/327, C07C69/54 (US,EP);
C07C67/60, C07C69/54 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1999/46] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM VERESTERN VON (METH)ACRYLSÄURE MIT EINEM ALKANOL | [1999/46] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE ESTERIFICATION OF (METH)ACRYLIC ACID WITH AN ALKANOL | [1999/46] | French: | PROCEDE D'ESTERIFICATION D'ACIDE (METH)ACRYLIQUE AVEC UN ALCANOL | [1999/46] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/46] | 05.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.07.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]US3227746 (FRITZ KNORR, et al) [DA] 1 * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 16 * * column 2 - column 4; example - ** column 4; claim - *; | [DA]DE19547485 (BASF AG [DE]) [DA] 1 * page 2, line 7 - line 42 * * page 3, line 45 - page 4, line 28 * * page 5, line 20 - line 46 * * page 5 - page 6; claim - *; | [DA]DE19547459 (BASF AG [DE]) [DA] 1 * page 2, line 7 - line 43 * * page 3, line 30 - page 4, line 13 * * page 5, line 5 - line 25 * * page 5; claim - * |