blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0973858

EP0973858 - DETERGENT BARS COMPRISING ADJUVANT POWDERS FOR DELIVERING BENEFIT AGENT AND PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURE OF SAID BARS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.05.2004
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip25.04.2008Change - representativepublished on 28.05.2008  [2008/22]
Applicant(s)For:GB 
Unilever PLC
Unilever House
Blackfriars
London
Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB
For:DE  ES  FR  IT 
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
[N/P]
Former [2003/27]For:GB 
UNILEVER PLC
Unilever House, Blackfriars
London EC4P 4BQ / GB
For:DE  ES  FR  IT 
UNILEVER N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
Former [2000/04]For:GB 
UNILEVER PLC
Unilever House Blackfriars
London EC4P 4BQ / GB
For:DE  ES  FR  IT 
UNILEVER N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
Inventor(s)01 / FARRELL, Terence, James
6613 McKinley Place
West New York, NJ 07093 / US
02 / QUINN, David
27 Harding Avenue
North Arlington, NJ 07031 / US
03 / McFANN, Gregory
710 River Renaissance
East Rutherford, NJ 07093 / US
04 / RATTINGER, Gail, Beth
315 Edgewood Avenue
Teaneck, NJ 07666 / US
05 / TSAUR, Liang, Sheng
12 Garnett Place
Norwood, NJ 07468 / US
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Elliott, Peter William
Unilever Patent Group
Colworth House
Sharnbrook
Bedford
MK44 1LQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/22]Elliott, Peter William
Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford
MK44 1LQ / GB
Former [2000/04]Elliott, Peter William
Unilever plc Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook
Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB
Application number, filing date98904167.823.01.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998EP00528
Priority number, dateUS1997082150221.03.1997         Original published format: US 821502
US1997082150121.03.1997         Original published format: US 821501
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9842814
Date:01.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973858
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0973858
Date:02.07.2003
Language:EN
[2003/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.10.1998
ClassificationIPC:C11D17/00, C11D11/00, C11D1/37, C11D3/22, C11D3/37
[2000/04]
CPC:
C11D17/006 (EP); C11D17/00 (KR); C11D3/18 (EP);
C11D3/222 (EP); C11D3/227 (EP); C11D3/3707 (EP);
C11D3/373 (EP); C11D3/3769 (EP); C11D3/38 (EP);
C11D3/382 (EP); C11D3/384 (EP); C11D9/225 (EP);
C11D9/24 (EP); C11D9/262 (EP); C11D9/40 (EP);
C11D1/123 (EP); C11D1/525 (EP); C11D1/90 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/04]
TitleGerman:REINIGUNGSMITTELSTÜCKE ENTHALTEND PULVERFÖRMIGE WIRKSTOFFE, UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG[2000/04]
English:DETERGENT BARS COMPRISING ADJUVANT POWDERS FOR DELIVERING BENEFIT AGENT AND PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURE OF SAID BARS[2000/04]
French:PAINS DETERGENTS CONTENANT DES POUDRES ADJUVANTES POUR LIBERER UN AGENT BENEFIQUE ET PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE CES PAINS[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase23.08.1999National basic fee paid 
23.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
23.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.07.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
12.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.03.2003Fee for grant paid
03.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.04.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
18.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
20.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]US4808322  (MCLAUGHLIN JAMES H [US]) [X] 1,5,6,8 * column 6, line 46 - column 7, line 29; examples 12-14 *;
 [X]US4148743  (SCHUBERT WARREN R) [X] 1,6-8 * column 3, line 49; examples I-VI *;
 [XD]US5096608  (SMALL LEONARD E [US], et al) [XD] 1,5,6,8 * table 2 *;
 [A]WO9526710  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 5, line 5 - page 23, line 30 *;
 [A]US5520840  (MASSARO MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * example 1 *;
 [A]US5154849  (VISSCHER MARTHA O [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 43 - column 12, line 48 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.