08.02.2008 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 12.03.2008 [2008/11] |
06.04.2007 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 09.05.2007 [2007/19] |
23.03.2007 |
Change - German title |
published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] |
02.03.2007 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 04.04.2007 [2007/14] |
23.01.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.10.2006 |
Change - German title |
published on 15.11.2006 [2006/46] |
12.10.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
12.10.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
25.05.2006 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
16.05.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
12.05.2006 |
Change - German title |
published on 14.06.2006 [2006/24] |
24.01.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.12.2005 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
24.01.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
24.01.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.11.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.09.2004 |
Change - applicant |
published on 27.10.2004 [2004/44] |
10.07.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.03.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.01.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.10.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.10.2003 |
First examination report |
|
29.01.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
05.02.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
23.01.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.01.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
26.11.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 12.01.2000 [2000/02] |
26.11.1999 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.01.2000 [2000/02] |
19.11.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.11.1999 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
03.08.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.02.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.11.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.08.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.08.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.03.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|