Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005026986 | Global Dossier | 03.02.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US93525004 | 07.09.2004 | US34176499 | 19.08.1999 | FR9700870 | 28.01.1997 | US4453102 | 11.01.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3676383B | Global Dossier | 27.07.2005 | B2 | JP2001501971 | 13.02.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9800154 | 28.01.1998 | FR9700870 | 28.01.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1795194 | Global Dossier | 30.04.2008 | A3 | EP1795194 | 13.06.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP98904238 | 28.01.1998 | FR9700870 | 28.01.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU6219398 | Global Dossier | 18.08.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9800154 | 28.01.1998 | FR9700870 | 28.01.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0969835 | Global Dossier | 04.04.2007 | B1 | EP0969835 | 12.01.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9800154 | 28.01.1998 | FR9700870 | 28.01.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9806801 | 16.05.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9800154 | 28.01.1998 | FR9700870 | 28.01.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2278661 | 30.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9800154 | 28.01.1998 | FR9700870 | 28.01.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69837473T | 13.12.2007 | T2 | DE69837473D1 | 16.05.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR9800154 | 28.01.1998 | FR9700870 | 28.01.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0969835T | 06.08.2007 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR9800154 | 28.01.1998 | FR9700870 | 28.01.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EE04630 | 15.06.2006 | B1 | EE9900304A | 15.02.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9800154 | 28.01.1998 | FR9700870 | 28.01.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1022829 | 25.08.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9800154 | 28.01.1998 | FR9700870 | 28.01.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IS5113 | 12.07.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9800154 | 28.01.1998 | FR9700870 | 28.01.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | LV12354 | 20.02.2000 | B | LV12354 | 20.10.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9800154 | 28.01.1998 | FR9700870 | 28.01.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MEP26508 | 10.06.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9800154 | 28.01.1998 | FR9700870 | 28.01.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO323696B | 25.06.2007 | B1 | NO993634L | 27.09.1999 | L | NO993634D0 | 27.07.1999 | D0 | Priority number | Date | FR9800154 | 28.01.1998 | FR9700870 | 28.01.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SK99799 | 12.06.2000 | A3 | Priority number | Date | FR9800154 | 28.01.1998 | FR9700870 | 28.01.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2002128302 | 12.09.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34176499 | 19.08.1999 | FR9700870 | 28.01.1997 | US4453102 | 11.01.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6344474 | 05.02.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | FR9800154 | 28.01.1998 | FR9700870 | 28.01.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9832441 | Global Dossier | 30.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9700870 | 28.01.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR011776 | 13.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9700870 | 28.01.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE358480T | 15.04.2007 | T1 | Priority number | Date | FR9700870 | 28.01.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DZ2405 | 04.01.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9700870 | 28.01.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2285760T | 16.11.2007 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR9700870 | 28.01.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2758723 | 23.04.1999 | B1 | FR2758723 | 31.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9700870 | 28.01.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GT199800021 | 22.07.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9700870 | 28.01.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP980042 | 31.10.1998 | A2 | Priority number | Date | FR9700870 | 28.01.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ID22216A | 16.09.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9700870 | 28.01.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY117251 | 30.06.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9700870 | 28.01.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT969835E | 12.07.2007 | E | Priority number | Date | FR9700870 | 28.01.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RS49830 | 07.08.2008 | B | YU35099 | 12.08.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9700870 | 28.01.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SA98181113 | 25.06.2006 | B1 | Priority number | Date | FR9700870 | 28.01.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TR199901721T | 21.10.1999 | T2 | Priority number | Date | FR9700870 | 28.01.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW450808B | 21.08.2001 | B | Priority number | Date | FR9700870 | 28.01.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | UY24847 | 21.04.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9700870 | 28.01.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA98691 | 05.08.1998 | B | Priority number | Date | FR9700870 | 28.01.1997 | Type | Divisional application | EP1795194 |