EP0901890 - PRINTING DEVICE WITH CUTTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [1999/11] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOMORI, Masayoshi 5-4-507, Makinokitamachi Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-1149 / JP | 02 /
ARAKAWA, Tohru 3-20-105, Kagura-cho Nichinomiya-shi, Hyogo 622-0977 / JP | 03 /
SHIRAGA, Shozoh 62-16, Nasuzukurikitamachi Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0083 / JP | 04 /
DOI, Yuji 4-8-106, Myokenzaka Katano-shi, Osaka 576-0021 / JP | 05 /
TANAKA, Toshio 5-15-4, Osumigaoka Kyotanabe-shi, Kyoto 610-0351 / JP | 06 /
KOSHI, Kazumine 32-13-504, Suikouen-cho Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0095 / JP | [1999/11] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/11] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98904375.7 | 18.02.1998 | [1999/11] | WO1998JP00675 | Priority number, date | JP19970035882 | 20.02.1997 Original published format: JP 3588297 | JP19970075411 | 27.03.1997 Original published format: JP 7541197 | JP19970120602 | 12.05.1997 Original published format: JP 12060297 | JP19970123681 | 14.05.1997 Original published format: JP 12368197 | [1999/11] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9836881 | Date: | 27.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0901890 | Date: | 17.03.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.08.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B26D1/20 | [1999/11] | CPC: |
B26D5/086 (EP,US);
B26D1/085 (EP,US);
B26D1/205 (EP,US);
B26D5/08 (EP,US);
B41J11/706 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/11] | Title | German: | SCHNEIDEVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN DRUCKER | [1999/11] | English: | PRINTING DEVICE WITH CUTTER | [1999/11] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'IMPRESSION A COUPEUSE | [1999/11] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.1998 | Translation filed | 20.10.1998 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.1998 | Search fee paid | 20.10.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/16] | 25.08.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0058900 (HONEYWELL INF SYSTEMS [IT]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPH07125812 (AMADA METRECS CO); | [A]JPS62166991 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND); | [Y]JPS6471693 (YAMATAKE HONEYWELL CO LTD); | [Y]JPH03208595 (GRAPHTEC KK); | [Y]JPH0586494U |