Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0897957
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
25.04.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] |
01.12.2006 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 03.01.2007 [2007/01] |
30.03.2006 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.03.2005 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
14.12.2004 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
31.03.2004 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
02.04.2003 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
28.02.2003 |
Change - representative |
published on 16.04.2003 [2003/16] |
31.01.2003 |
First examination report |
|
29.01.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
28.06.2002 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 14.08.2002 [2002/33] |
28.06.2002 |
Change - classification |
published on 14.08.2002 [2002/33] |
15.02.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
27.01.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
02.06.2000 |
Change - applicant |
published on 19.07.2000 [2000/29] |
02.06.2000 |
Change - inventor |
published on 19.07.2000 [2000/29] |
28.01.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
08.01.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 24.02.1999 [1999/08] |
08.01.1999 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 24.02.1999 [1999/08] |
17.12.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.12.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.12.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.03.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|