Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9837153 | Global Dossier | 27.08.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP3889897 | 24.02.1997 | CA2252614 | 20.02.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH10237352 | Global Dossier | 08.09.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | JP3889897 | 24.02.1997 | CA2252614 | 20.02.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0897957 | Global Dossier | 14.08.2002 | A4 | EP0897957 | 24.02.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP9800704 | 20.02.1998 | JP3889897 | 24.02.1997 | CA2252614 | 20.02.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2252614 | 27.08.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP3889897 | 24.02.1997 | CA2252614 | 20.02.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20000064975 | 06.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | JP9800704 | 20.02.1998 | JP3889897 | 24.02.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6099969 | 08.08.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | JP9800704 | 20.02.1998 | JP3889897 | 24.02.1997 | CA2252614 | 20.02.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW491883B | 21.06.2002 | B | Priority number | Date | JP3889897 | 24.02.1997 |