EP1051857 - PROJECTION TELEVISIONS WITH HOLOGRAPHIC SCREENS HAVING STACKED ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing SA 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/46] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing S.A. 46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HALL, Estill, Thone, Jr. 7904 Dawson Drive Fishers, IN 46038 / US | 02 /
PFILE, Wendy, Rene 4540 Eastbourne Drive Indianapolis, IN 46226 / US | [2000/46] | Representative(s) | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte Technicolor European Patent Operations 1-5 Rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte Thomson multimedia Patent Department 46 Quai A. le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2000/46] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte THOMSON multimedia, 46 quai A. Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 98904725.3 | 29.01.1998 | [2000/46] | WO1998US01618 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9939510 | Date: | 05.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1051857 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1051857 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/31, G03B21/62, G02B5/32 | [2000/46] | CPC: |
H04N9/31 (EP,KR);
G02B5/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/46] | Title | German: | PROJEKTIONSFERNSEHGERÄTE MIT HOLOGRAPHISCHEN BILDSCHIRMEN UND AUFEINANDERGESTAPELTEN ELEMENTEN | [2000/46] | English: | PROJECTION TELEVISIONS WITH HOLOGRAPHIC SCREENS HAVING STACKED ELEMENTS | [2000/46] | French: | TELEVISEUR A PROJECTION A ECRAN HOLOGRAPHIQUE DOTE D'ELEMENTS EMPILES | [2000/46] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/46] | 17.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [E]US5796499 (WENYON MICHAEL M [US]) [E] 1 * column 5, line 10 - column 9, line 51 *; | [A]JPH0973132 ; | [A]WO9607953 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5046793 (HOCKLEY BERNARD S [CA], et al) [A] 1 * column 6, line 24 - column 8, line 31 *; | [A]JPH0682625 ; | [A]WO9710523 (RICHMOND HOLOGRAPHIC RES [GB], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 20 - column 6, line 34 *; | [A]WO9534832 (THOMSON CSF [FR], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 7, line 28 - page 8, line 15 *; | [A]WO9504303 (PHYSICAL OPTICS CORP [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0751419 (KURARAY CO [JP]) [A] 1 * page 1, line 12 - line 39 *; | [A]EP0671653 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970731), vol. 97, no. 7, & JP09073132 A 19970318 (CASIO COMPUTER LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940623), vol. 18, no. 333, Database accession no. (P - 1759), & JP06082625 A 00000000 (RICOH CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |