EP1015217 - SYSTEM FOR CONTINUOUSLY MANUFACTURING A COMPOSITE PREFORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.05.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.07.2003 [2003/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Compsys, Inc. 7705 Technology Drive West Melborne, FL 32904 / US | [2000/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEWIT, Scott, M. 1975 Rivershore Drive Indialantic, FL 32908 / US | 02 /
MACKANESS, Miles 8735 S. Tropical Trail Merritt Island, FL 32952 / US | [2000/27] | Representative(s) | Dendorfer, Claus Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/27] | Dendorfer, Claus Dr. Claus Dendorfer Wächtershäuser & Hartz, Tal 29 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98904818.6 | 29.01.1998 | [2000/27] | WO1998US01916 | Priority number, date | US19970794001 | 03.02.1997 Original published format: US 794001 | [2000/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9833635 | Date: | 06.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1015217 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.08.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B29C44/32 | [2000/27] | CPC: |
B29C44/1261 (EP,US);
B29C44/1209 (EP,US);
B29C44/60 (EP,US);
B29C70/086 (EP,US);
B29C70/50 (EP,US);
B32B5/24 (EP,US);
B32B5/26 (EP,US);
B32B5/28 (EP,US);
B60R13/02 (EP,US);
B60R13/08 (EP,US);
B63B5/24 (EP,US);
B29C2791/001 (EP,US);
B29C44/14 (EP);
B29K2105/0809 (EP,US);
B29K2105/0854 (EP,US);
B63B2231/50 (EP,US);
B63B2231/52 (EP,US);
Y10T137/0324 (EP,US);
Y10T137/2529 (EP,US);
Y10T137/2531 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7759 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7761 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/27] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR KONTINUIERLICHEN HERSTELLUNG EINES VORFORM AUS VERBUNDSWERKSTOFF | [2000/27] | English: | SYSTEM FOR CONTINUOUSLY MANUFACTURING A COMPOSITE PREFORM | [2000/27] | French: | SYSTEME DE FABRICATION EN CONTINU D'UNE PREFORME COMPOSITE | [2000/27] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.1999 | Search fee paid | 03.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 03.08.1999 | Examination requested [2000/27] | 28.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/28] | 20.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4613471 (HARRIS HOLTON E [US]) [X] 17 * the whole document * [Y] 1-16,19,21,22; | [Y]US3585678 (NEUMANN PETER, et al) [Y] 1-16,19,21,22 * claim 1 *; | [PY]US5653923 (SPOO KEVIN J [US], et al) [PY] 1-16,19,21,22 * claim 1 *; | [A]US5429066 (LEWIT SCOTT [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * columns 2-4 *; | [A]DE949307 (GEN MOTORS CORP) [A] 1-22 * figure 1; claims 1,2 * | International search | [Y]US3585678 (NEUMANN PETER, et al); | [Y]US4613471 (HARRIS HOLTON E [US]); | [A]US5429066 (LEWIT SCOTT [US], et al); | [AP]US5664518 (LEWIT SCOTT M [US], et al); | [A]US4128369 (KEMERER WILLIAM J, et al); | [A]US4422988 (KORNYLAK ANDREW T [US]); | [A]US4171193 (RAHLFS HERBERT K [DE]) |