EP1021857 - AERIALLY INSTALLED COMMUNICATIONS CABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.03.2002 [2002/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMSCOPE INC. OF NORTH CAROLINA P.O. Box 339 Hickory, NC 28603-0339 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/30] | For all designated states Commscope, Inc. of North Carolina P.O. Box 339 Hickory, NC 28603-0339 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIALENIOS, Michael, D. 4103 Hallam Court Charlotte, NC 28269 / US | 02 /
IRVIN, David, J. 140 Spring Street Hudson, NC 28638 / US | 03 /
BRYANT, Andy, W., Jr. 4002 Allison Street Hickory, NC 28601 / US | [2000/30] | Representative(s) | MacDougall, Donald Carmichael, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/30] | MacDougall, Donald Carmichael, et al Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE, Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 98905019.0 | 05.02.1998 | [2000/30] | WO1998US02481 | Priority number, date | US19970797555 | 06.02.1997 Original published format: US 797555 | US19970848512 | 28.04.1997 Original published format: US 848512 | [2000/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9835416 | Date: | 13.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1021857 | Date: | 26.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H02G7/05 | [2000/30] | CPC: |
H02G7/06 (EP);
H02G7/05 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/30] | Title | German: | LUFTKABEL | [2000/30] | English: | AERIALLY INSTALLED COMMUNICATIONS CABLE | [2000/30] | French: | CABLE AERIEN | [2000/30] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.04.1999 | Examination requested [2000/30] | 29.08.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/13] | 12.10.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.04.2000 | 28.02.2001 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]US2473965 (MORRISON JAMES J, et al) [DA] 1,9 * column 1, line 1 - line 24; figure 3 *; | [A]US2870237 (WILKINS CHARLES L, et al) [A] 1,9 * column 1, line 15 - line 21; figure 1 *; | [A]US4832442 (PAPPAS VINCENT J [US]) [A] 1,9 * figure 2 * |