EP1015008 - COMPOUNDS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR DELIVERING ACTIVE AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Emisphere Technologies, Inc. 240 Cedar Knolls Road Cedar Knolls, New Jersey 07927 / US | [2008/25] |
Former [2000/27] | For all designated states Emisphere Technologies, Inc. 765 Old Saw Mill River Road Tarrytown, New York 10591 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEONE-BAY, Andrea 20 Woodland Way Ridgefield, CT 06877 / US | 02 /
HO, Koc-Kan 104 Pheasant Run Monmouth Junction, NJ 08852 / US | 03 /
LEIPOLD, Harry, R. 63 Town Green Drive Elmsford, NY 10523 / US | 04 /
MILSTEIN, Sam, J. 15 Beechtree Lane Larchmont, NY 10538 / US | 05 /
SARRUBI, Donald, J. 18 Lawton Lane Bronxville, NY 10708 / US | 06 /
WANG, Eric 9930 Timberknoll Lane Ellicott City, Maryland 21042 / US | 07 /
GSCHNEIDNER, David 44 Cerretta Street 6 Stamford, CT 06907 / US | [2001/34] |
Former [2000/27] | 01 /
LEONE-BAY, Andrea 20 Woodland Way Ridgefield, CT 06877 / US | ||
02 /
HO, Koc-Kan 104 Pheasant Run Monmouth Junction, NJ 08852 / US | |||
03 /
LEIPOLD, Harry, R. 63 Town Green Drive Elmsford, NY 10523 / US | |||
04 /
MILSTEIN, Sam, J. 15 Beechtree Lane Larchmont, NY 10538 / US | |||
05 /
SARRUBI, Donald, J. 18 Lawton Lane Bronxville, NY 10708 / US | |||
06 /
WANG, Eric 1120 Warburton Avenue 1F Yonkers, NY 10701 / US | |||
07 /
GSCHNEIDNER, David 44 Cerretta Street 6 Stamford, CT 06907 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2015/32] |
Former [2000/27] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98905042.2 | 06.02.1998 | [2000/27] | WO1998US02619 | Priority number, date | US19970796336 | 07.02.1997 Original published format: US 796336 | US19970796340 | 07.02.1997 Original published format: US 796340 | US19970796338 | 07.02.1997 Original published format: US 796338 | US19970797813 | 07.02.1997 Original published format: US 797813 | US19970797816 | 07.02.1997 Original published format: US 797816 | US19970797820 | 07.02.1997 Original published format: US 797820 | US19970797100 | 07.02.1997 Original published format: US 797100 | US19970796337 | 07.02.1997 Original published format: US 796337 | US19970796334 | 07.02.1997 Original published format: US 796334 | US19970796341 | 07.02.1997 Original published format: US 796341 | US19970796339 | 07.02.1997 Original published format: US 796339 | US19970797817 | 07.02.1997 Original published format: US 797817 | US19970796335 | 07.02.1997 Original published format: US 796335 | [2000/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9834632 | Date: | 13.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1015008 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1015008 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.08.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/23, A61K47/18 | [2006/32] | CPC: |
A61K31/727 (EP,US);
A61K38/21 (EP);
A61K38/27 (EP);
A61K38/29 (EP);
A61K47/183 (EP,US);
A61K9/1617 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
C07C229/42 (EP);
C07C233/51 (EP);
C07C233/54 (EP);
C07C233/69 (EP);
C07C233/81 (EP);
C07C233/83 (EP);
C07C235/12 (EP);
C07C235/24 (EP);
C07C235/34 (EP);
C07C235/38 (EP);
C07C235/52 (EP);
C07C235/56 (EP);
C07C235/60 (EP);
C07C235/64 (EP);
C07C235/66 (EP);
C07C235/74 (EP);
C07C237/12 (EP);
C07C237/20 (EP);
C07C237/36 (EP);
C07C237/40 (EP);
C07C237/42 (EP);
C07C243/38 (EP);
C07C259/06 (EP);
C07C271/28 (EP);
C07C271/54 (EP);
C07D209/48 (EP);
C07D211/62 (EP);
C07D213/81 (EP);
C07D213/82 (EP);
C07D239/42 (EP);
C07D241/24 (EP);
C07D257/04 (EP);
C07D295/192 (EP);
C07D311/12 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2000/27] | A61K38/00, A61K47/12, C07C229/00, C07C233/00, C07C317/14, C07D209/02, C07D239/02, C07D241/02, C07D257/04, C07D311/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2015/32] |
Former [2000/27] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGEN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR ADMINISTRATION AKTIVER STOFFE | [2000/27] | English: | COMPOUNDS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR DELIVERING ACTIVE AGENTS | [2000/27] | French: | COMPOSES ET COMPOSITIONS DESTINES A L'ADMINISTRATION D'AGENTS ACTIFS | [2000/27] | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.1999 | Search fee paid | 06.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 06.08.1999 | Examination requested [2000/27] | 26.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP00122704.0 / EP1093819 | EP99117292.5 / EP0993831 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.05.2008 | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 06.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 07.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 07.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 07.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 13.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 18 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LU MC NL PT SE | Date: | 09.11.2005 | [2006/13] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.08.2015 | BE | 05.08.2015 | DK | 05.08.2015 | ES | 05.08.2015 | FI | 05.08.2015 | IT | 05.08.2015 | MC | 05.08.2015 | NL | 05.08.2015 | SE | 05.08.2015 | GR | 06.11.2015 | PT | 07.12.2015 | GB | 06.02.2016 | IE | 06.02.2016 | LU | 06.02.2016 | CH | 29.02.2016 | FR | 29.02.2016 | LI | 29.02.2016 | [2017/10] |
Former [2017/08] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
BE | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
GB | 06.02.2016 | ||
IE | 06.02.2016 | ||
LU | 06.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
BE | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
IE | 06.02.2016 | ||
LU | 06.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
BE | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
LU | 06.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
LU | 06.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/43] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
LU | 06.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/26] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 05.08.2015 | |
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 05.08.2015 | |
GR | 06.11.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0576941 (NISSHIN FLOUR MILLING CO [JP]) [A] 1-14* claim - *; | [X]WO9612473 (EMISPHERE TECH INC [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * claim - *; | [XP]WO9736480 (EMISPHERE TECH INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-14 * claim - * | International search | [X]US4238506 (BOSIES ELMAR [DE], et al); | [X]US4757066 (SHIOKARI TAKASHI [JP], et al); | [A]US5541155 (LEONE-BAY ANDREA [US], et al); | [X]WO9630036 (EMISPHERE TECH INC [US], et al); | [AP]US5643957 (DEMORIN FRENEL [US], et al); | [AP]US5650386 (LEONE-BAY ANDREA [US], et al); | [XP]US5705529 (MATYUS PETER [HU], et al) | by applicant | US4239754 | US4925673 | US5206384 | WO9612473 | WO9630036 | - PATEL ET AL., FEBS LETTERS, (1976), vol. 62, page 60 | - HASHIMOTO ET AL., ENDOCRINOLOGY JAPAN, (1979), vol. 26, page 337 | - Chambers Biological Dictionary, CHAMBERS CAMBRIDGE, (1989), page 215 | US19940335148 | US19950414654 |