EP1009893 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ROOF COVERING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/25] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRAHAM, Joseph 3240 Saratoga Lane North Plymouth, MN 55441 / US | 02 /
KENNEDY, Keith 13395 Elmcrest Avenue North White Bear Lake, MN 55110 / US | 03 /
MEYER, Vincent 200 West Marie Avenue West St. Paul, MN 55118 / US | [2000/25] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/25] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98905097.6 | 17.02.1998 | [2000/25] | WO1998US02943 | Priority number, date | US19970801535 | 18.02.1997 Original published format: US 801535 | [2000/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9836139 | Date: | 20.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1009893 | Date: | 21.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | E04D5/14, E04D1/26 | [2000/25] | CPC: |
E04D1/34 (EP,US);
E04D1/2918 (EP,US);
E04D5/143 (EP);
E04D5/147 (EP);
E04D5/148 (EP);
E04D1/26 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/25] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR DACHBEDECKUNG | [2000/25] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ROOF COVERING | [2000/25] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE COUVERTURE DE TOIT | [2000/25] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.09.1999 | Examination requested [2000/25] | 10.05.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]DE4100902 (HUELS TROISDORF [DE]) [X] 1,3-6,10,11,20-22 * column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 42; figure - * [A] 2,7-9,14-19 [Y] 12,13,23; | [YA]US4738884 (ALGRIM DONALD J [US], et al) [Y] 12,13,23 * column 5, paragraph 2; figure - * [A] 14-19,24-26; | [A]US5239802 (ROBINSON NORMAN M [US]) [A] 12-17,19,24,25 * column 43, line 6 - line 43; figure - *; | [A]EP0325528 (CAOUTCHOUC MANUF PLASTIQUE [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [DA]US4322875 (BROWN JAMES N, et al) [DA] 1,3,5,7,8,11,17,25 * column 3, paragraph 2; figure - *; | [DA]US4290832 (KALLEBERG MELVIN O) [DA] 1 * abstract * |