EP0970234 - METHOD FOR USING A VEGETABLE BIOMASS AND A SCREW PRESS TO CARRY OUT SAID METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2005 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 2B BIOTEC AG Neugutstrasse 66 8600 Dübendorf / CH | [2004/10] |
Former [2000/02] | For all designated states 2B AG Neugutstrassa 66 8600 Dübendorf / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANSEN, Graeme Kettbergstrasse 22 CH-8049 Zürich / CH | 02 /
GRASS, Stefan Bächlerstrasse 41 CH-8046 Zürich / CH | [2000/02] | Representative(s) | REHBERG HÜPPE + PARTNER Patentanwälte PartG mbB Robert-Gernhardt-Platz 1 37073 Göttingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/14] | Patentanwälte Rehberg + Hüppe Postfach 31 62 37021 Göttingen / DE | ||
Former [2000/02] | Köver, François, et al Schmauder & Partner AG Patentanwälte Zwängiweg 7 8038 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 98905197.4 | 09.03.1998 | [2000/02] | WO1998CH00094 | Priority number, date | CH19970000647 | 18.03.1997 Original published format: CH 64797 | [2000/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9841646 | Date: | 24.09.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0970234 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0970234 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C12P7/06, A23K1/00, C12M1/107 | [2000/02] | CPC: |
C12P7/06 (EP,US);
A23K10/10 (EP,US);
C12M21/04 (EP,US);
C12M21/12 (EP,US);
C12M45/02 (EP,US);
C12M45/04 (EP,US);
C12M45/09 (EP,US);
C12M45/20 (EP,US);
Y02E50/10 (EP,US);
Y02E50/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/02] | Extension states | LT | 13.09.1999 | SI | 13.09.1999 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERWERTUNG VON PFLANZLICHER BIOMASSE UND SCHNECKENPRESSE ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DIESES VERFAHRENS | [2000/02] | English: | METHOD FOR USING A VEGETABLE BIOMASS AND A SCREW PRESS TO CARRY OUT SAID METHOD | [2000/02] | French: | PROCEDE DE VALORISATION D'UNE BIOMASSE VEGETALE ET PRESSE A VIS POUR LA MISE EN OEUVRE DE CE PROCEDE | [2000/02] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.09.1999 | Examination requested [2000/02] | 13.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 11.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/33] | Request for further processing for: | 11.06.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 11.06.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.07.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 25.08.2004 | FI | 25.08.2004 | FR | 25.08.2004 | GB | 25.08.2004 | IE | 25.08.2004 | IT | 25.08.2004 | NL | 25.08.2004 | DK | 25.11.2004 | GR | 25.11.2004 | SE | 25.11.2004 | PT | 25.01.2005 | BE | 31.03.2005 | [2008/15] |
Former [2007/17] | ES | 25.08.2004 | |
FI | 25.08.2004 | ||
FR | 25.08.2004 | ||
GB | 25.08.2004 | ||
IE | 25.08.2004 | ||
NL | 25.08.2004 | ||
DK | 25.11.2004 | ||
GR | 25.11.2004 | ||
SE | 25.11.2004 | ||
BE | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/32] | FI | 25.08.2004 | |
FR | 25.08.2004 | ||
GB | 25.08.2004 | ||
IE | 25.08.2004 | ||
NL | 25.08.2004 | ||
DK | 25.11.2004 | ||
GR | 25.11.2004 | ||
SE | 25.11.2004 | ||
BE | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 25.08.2004 | |
GB | 25.08.2004 | ||
IE | 25.08.2004 | ||
NL | 25.08.2004 | ||
DK | 25.11.2004 | ||
GR | 25.11.2004 | ||
SE | 25.11.2004 | ||
BE | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 25.08.2004 | |
GB | 25.08.2004 | ||
IE | 25.08.2004 | ||
NL | 25.08.2004 | ||
DK | 25.11.2004 | ||
GR | 25.11.2004 | ||
SE | 25.11.2004 | ||
BE | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 25.08.2004 | |
GB | 25.08.2004 | ||
IE | 25.08.2004 | ||
DK | 25.11.2004 | ||
GR | 25.11.2004 | ||
SE | 25.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 25.08.2004 | |
IE | 25.08.2004 | ||
DK | 25.11.2004 | ||
GR | 25.11.2004 | ||
SE | 25.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | FI | 25.08.2004 | |
DK | 25.11.2004 | ||
GR | 25.11.2004 | ||
SE | 25.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 25.08.2004 | |
GR | 25.11.2004 | ||
SE | 25.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 25.08.2004 | |
SE | 25.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 25.11.2004 | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPS5814995 ; | [Y]EP0005703 (LANG JOHN LESTER) [Y] 1,2,4-6,8,9 * page 5, line 1 - page 6, line 18; claims 1,2 *; | [A]DE2919518 (UTIKAL HANS DR) [A] 1 * figures 2,3; claim - *; | [Y]US4302543 (BENYAEV NEGMAT E, et al) [Y] 1,2,4-6,8,9 * column 1, line 19 - line 35; figure . * * column 2, line 60 - column 5, line 20 *; | [Y]US4321328 (HOGE WILLIAM H) [Y] 1,2,4-6,8,9 * column 4, line 24 - column 5, line 47; figure .; claim - *; | [XY]WO8201483 (HOLLOWAY CLIFFORD C) [X] 1,4-6 * page 8, line 13 - page 10, line 10; figure .; claims 1-3,6,8,9,11,12 * [Y] 1,2,4-6,8,9; | [Y]FR2550550 (KRUPP INDUSTRIETECH [DE]) [Y] 1,2,4-6,8,9 * figure -; claim - *; | [Y]EP0213023 (VALPI UNION COOP AGRICOLES [FR]) [Y] 1,2,4-6,8,9 * figure .; claims 1-4,6 *; | [A]DE3715953 (SCHRAUFSTETTER WILFRIED [DE], et al) [A] 1* figure -; claim - *; | [Y]US4842877 (TYSON GEORGE J [US]) [Y] 1,2,4-6,8,9 * figure .; claim - *; | [Y]DE4423099 (BUEHLER AG [CH]) [Y] 1,2,4-6,8,9 * column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 1; figure . * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830409), vol. 007, no. 086, Database accession no. (C - 161), & JP58014995 A 19830128 (MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KK) [Y] 1,2,8,9 * abstract * |