blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0967981

EP0967981 - MEDICAMENT CONTAINING BETASITOSTEROL AND/OR PHYTOSTEROL/BETASITOSTEROL MIXTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  14.07.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip14.07.2000Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 30.08.2000 [2000/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dr. Kief Lizenz Verwertungs Gesellschaft MbH
Londoner Ring 105-107
67069 Ludwigshafen / DE
[2000/01]
Inventor(s)01 / KIEF, Horst
Londoner Ring 105
D-67069 Ludwigshafen / DE
[2000/01]
Representative(s)von Füner, Alexander, et al
v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]von Füner, Alexander, Prof.h.c. Dr., et al
v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date98905304.616.01.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998EP00227
Priority number, dateDE199710126416.01.1997         Original published format: DE 19701264
[2000/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9831372
Date:23.07.1998
Language:DE
[1998/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0967981
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.07.1998
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/575
[2000/01]
CPC:
A61K31/575 (EP,US); A61K31/56 (EP,US); A61K36/47 (EP,US);
A61K36/889 (EP,US)
C-Set:
A61K31/56, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/575, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   ES,   FR [2000/01]
TitleGerman:HEILMITTEL, ENTHALTEND BETASITOSTERIN UND/ODER PHYTOSTEROL/BETASITOSTERIN-GEMISCHE[2000/01]
English:MEDICAMENT CONTAINING BETASITOSTEROL AND/OR PHYTOSTEROL/BETASITOSTEROL MIXTURES[2000/01]
French:MEDICAMENT CONTENANT DE LA BETASITOSTERINE ET/OU DES MELANGES PHYTOSTEROL-BETASITOSTERINE[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase12.08.1999National basic fee paid 
12.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
12.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
07.07.2000Application withdrawn by applicant  [2000/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]JPH07304684  ;
 [X]SU1138162  ;
 [X]RU2069557  ;
 [X]JPS63156727  ;
 [X]JPH0881352  ;
 [X]JPH08104632  ;
 [PX]JPH09169659  ;
 [X]JPH07277986  ;
 [Y]JPH0225425  ;
 [X]GB938937  (EASTMAN KODAK CO) [X] 1-21 * page 2, lines 44-59 *;
 [X]US4260603  (PEGEL KARL H, et al) [X] 1-21 * column 7 - column 8; example 4 * * column 4, line 37 - line 64 *;
 [X]EP0203277  (MORINAGA MILK INDUSTRY CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-21 * claim 6 *;
 [X]DE3546360  (MUELLER KARL HEINZ DR [DE]) [X] 1-21 * column 2, line 37 - column 3, line 11 * * claims 1-6 *;
 [X]EP0358970  (ROECAR HOLDINGS NV [NL]) [X] 1-21 * column 1, line 34 - line 47 * * column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 13 * * claims 1-4 *;
 [X]GB2238476  (LALVANI K T) [X] 1-21 * page 4; example 5 *;
 [Y]EP0509656  (ROOPEROL NA NV [NL]) [Y] 1-21* claims 1-20 *;
 [Y]EP0514328  (MEDICHEMIE AG [CH]) [Y] 1-21 * claims 1-3 *;
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 96, no. 04, Database accession no. 96-035835, XP002062812 & JPH07304684 A 19951121 (SHU R) [X] 1-21 * abstract *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 85, no. 34, Database accession no. 85-208922, XP002062813 & SU1138162 A 19850207 (LENINGRAD FORESTRY ACAD) [X] 1-21 * abstract *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 97, no. 29, Database accession no. 97-318112, XP002062814 & RU2069557 C 19961127 (FITOLON CO LTD) [X] 1-21 * abstract *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 88, no. 32, Database accession no. 88-223012, XP002062815 & JPS63156727 A 19880629 (QP CORP) [X] 1-21 * abstract *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 96, no. 22, Database accession no. 96-217163, XP002062816 & JPH0881352 A 19960326 (OKAYASU SHOTEN KK) [X] 1-21 * abstract *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 96, no. 26, Database accession no. 96-255075, XP002062817 & JPH08104632 A 19960423 (NIPPON SEIKA KK) [X] 1-21 * abstract *
 [PX]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 97, no. 36, Database accession no. 97-389350, XP002062811 & JPH09169659 A 19970630 (NISSEI MARINE KOGYO KK) [PX] 1-21 * abstract *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 95, no. 51, Database accession no. 95-400897, XP002062950 & JPH07277986 A 19951024 (HOSONOYA K) [X] 1-21 * abstract *
 [Y]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 90, no. 10, Database accession no. 90-071774, XP002062810 & JPH0225425 A 19900126 (NIPPON HAM KK) [Y] 1-21 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.