Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0954707
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
06.06.2008 |
Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative |
published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] |
18.06.2004 |
Opposition rejected |
published on 04.08.2004 [2004/32] |
27.02.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that opposition is rejected |
|
13.01.2004 |
Deletion: Date of oral proceedings |
|
08.11.2003 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
05.11.2002 |
Observations of proprietor on opposition |
|
12.09.2002 |
Observations of proprietor on opposition |
|
16.08.2002 |
Opposition filed |
published on 02.10.2002 [2002/40] |
13.08.2002 |
Unpublished change to opponent data |
|
21.09.2001 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 07.11.2001 [2001/45] |
11.07.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
02.05.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
02.05.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
12.01.2001 |
First examination report |
|
11.01.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
20.12.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.12.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
24.09.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.11.1999 [1999/45] |
24.09.1999 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 10.11.1999 [1999/45] |
22.07.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.07.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.11.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.10.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.09.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|