Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU6096298 | Global Dossier | 18.08.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9800346 | 23.01.1998 | DE19702444 | 24.01.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0954707 | Global Dossier | 07.11.2001 | B1 | EP0954707 | 10.11.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP9800346 | 23.01.1998 | DE19702444 | 24.01.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE208466T | 15.11.2001 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP9800346 | 23.01.1998 | DE19702444 | 24.01.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59802059D1 | 13.12.2001 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP9800346 | 23.01.1998 | DE19702444 | 24.01.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9832982 | Global Dossier | 30.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19702444 | 24.01.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19702444 | 30.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19702444 | 24.01.1997 |