EP1027267 - MULTI-DOSE WOUND GEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2002 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.10.2002 [2002/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/33] | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company 345 Park Avenue New York, N.Y. 10154 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WARING, Michael, J. 16 Escolme Drive Greasby, Wirral L49 1SE / GB | 02 /
JACQUES, Elizabeth 9 Cedar Grove Hoole, Chester CH2 3LQ / GB | [2000/33] | Representative(s) | Mays, Julie, et al Barker Brettell LLP First Floor, Atrium Court 15-17 Jockey's Fields London WC1R 4BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/49] | Mays, Julie, et al Barker Brettel, Patent Attorneys, 10-12 Priests Bridge London SW15 5JE / GB | ||
Former [2001/22] | Colmer, Stephen Gary, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | ||
Former [2000/33] | Mays, Julie Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Patent Department, Swakeleys House, Milton Road Ickenham, Uxbridge UB10 8NS / GB | Application number, filing date | 98905380.6 | 22.01.1998 | [2000/33] | WO1998EP00526 | Priority number, date | GB19970001552 | 25.01.1997 Original published format: GB 9701552 | [2000/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9832675 | Date: | 30.07.1998 | [1998/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1027267 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1027267 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61L24/00 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
B65D83/62 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/36] | A61L25/00 | ||
Former IPC [2000/33] | B65D83/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/33] | Title | German: | MEHRFACH-DOSIERSPENDER FÜR WUNDGELE | [2000/33] | English: | MULTI-DOSE WOUND GEL | [2000/33] | French: | GEL POUR BLESSURES CONTENU DANS UN FLACON MULTIDOSE | [2000/33] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.08.1999 | Examination requested [2000/33] | 10.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0017147 (LECHNER GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1-12 * figure 1 ** claims 11,13,15 *; | [Y]US5059187 (SPERRY CHARLES R [US], et al) [Y] 9 * column 6, line 6 - line 29 * * figure 1 *; | [XY]EP0560014 (ATRIX LAB INC [US]) [X] 1,10-12 * column 14, line 10 - column 16, line 7 * [Y] 2-8; | [DY]EP0666081 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US]) [DY] 2-8 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0693292 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON MEDICAL [US]) [Y] 9 * page 3, line 9 - line 24 * |