EP0968216 - PHOSPHINE LIGANDS WITH AMINO ACID GROUPS, METHOD FOR THEIR PRODUCTION AND USE THEREOF AS CATALYST COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2003 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Celanese Chemicals Europe GmbH Lurgiallee 14 60439 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2000/04] |
Former [2000/01] | For all designated states Celanese GmbH Lurgiallee 14 60439 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STELZER, Othmar Auf der Kante 67 D-42349 Wuppertal / DE | 02 /
TEPPER, Michael Marienstrasse 102 D-42105 Wuppertal / DE | [2000/01] | Application number, filing date | 98905389.7 | 03.02.1998 | [2000/01] | WO1998EP00555 | Priority number, date | DE1997104491 | 07.02.1997 Original published format: DE 19704491 | [2000/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9834939 | Date: | 13.08.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0968216 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0968216 | Date: | 16.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/02 | [2000/01] | CPC: |
C07F9/5022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/01] | Title | German: | PHOSPHIN-LIGANDEN MIT AMINOSÄUREGRUPPEN, EIN VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG SOWIE IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS KATALYSATORBESTANDTEILE | [2000/01] | English: | PHOSPHINE LIGANDS WITH AMINO ACID GROUPS, METHOD FOR THEIR PRODUCTION AND USE THEREOF AS CATALYST COMPONENTS | [2000/01] | French: | LIGANDS PHOSPHINE A GROUPES AMINOACIDES, LEUR PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME CONSTITUANTS DE CATALYSEURS | [2000/01] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.09.1999 | Examination requested [2000/01] | 18.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 23.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 16.10.2002 | GR | 16.10.2002 | IE | 16.10.2002 | IT | 16.10.2002 | DK | 16.01.2003 | PT | 16.01.2003 | SE | 16.01.2003 | AT | 03.02.2003 | LU | 03.02.2003 | BE | 28.02.2003 | ES | 29.04.2003 | [2008/15] |
Former [2007/17] | FI | 16.10.2002 | |
GR | 16.10.2002 | ||
IE | 16.10.2002 | ||
DK | 16.01.2003 | ||
PT | 16.01.2003 | ||
SE | 16.01.2003 | ||
AT | 03.02.2003 | ||
LU | 03.02.2003 | ||
BE | 28.02.2003 | ||
ES | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | FI | 16.10.2002 | |
GR | 16.10.2002 | ||
IE | 16.10.2002 | ||
PT | 16.01.2003 | ||
SE | 16.01.2003 | ||
AT | 03.02.2003 | ||
LU | 03.02.2003 | ||
BE | 28.02.2003 | ||
ES | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/31] | FI | 16.10.2002 | |
GR | 16.10.2002 | ||
IE | 16.10.2002 | ||
PT | 16.01.2003 | ||
SE | 16.01.2003 | ||
AT | 03.02.2003 | ||
BE | 28.02.2003 | ||
ES | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | FI | 16.10.2002 | |
GR | 16.10.2002 | ||
IE | 16.10.2002 | ||
PT | 16.01.2003 | ||
SE | 16.01.2003 | ||
BE | 28.02.2003 | ||
ES | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | FI | 16.10.2002 | |
GR | 16.10.2002 | ||
IE | 16.10.2002 | ||
PT | 16.01.2003 | ||
SE | 16.01.2003 | ||
ES | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | FI | 16.10.2002 | |
GR | 16.10.2002 | ||
IE | 16.10.2002 | ||
PT | 16.01.2003 | ||
SE | 16.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/42] | GR | 16.10.2002 | |
IE | 16.10.2002 | ||
PT | 16.01.2003 | ||
SE | 16.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GR | 16.10.2002 | |
PT | 16.01.2003 | ||
SE | 16.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/29] | PT | 16.01.2003 | |
SE | 16.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/27] | SE | 16.01.2003 | Cited in | International search | [PX] - Michael Tepper et al, "A Systematic Synthetic Approach to Phosphinophenyl-glycine and-alanine Chiral Phosphine Ligands with Amino Acid Moieties", Tetrahedron Letters, (199703), vol. 38, no. 13, doi:doi:10.1016/S0040-4039(97)00335-3, XP004056644 [PX] 1-7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(97)00335-3 | [A] - GILBERTSON S. R., ET AL., "PALLADIUM-CATALYZED SYNTHESIS OF PHOSPHINE-CONTAINING AMINO ACIDS.", The Journal of Organic Chemistry, American Chemical Society, US, US, (19960101), doi:10.1021/jo960077z, ISSN 0022-3263, page 2922/2923., XP002900184 [A] 1-7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo960077z |