blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0970103

EP0970103 - ANTIGESTAGENIC STEROIDS WITH A FLUORINATED 17ALPHA-ALKYL CHAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.02.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip21.02.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.04.2003  [2003/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Schering Aktiengesellschaft
Müllerstrasse 178, Postfach 65 03 11
13353 Berlin / DE
[2000/02]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHWEDE, Wolfgang
Klosterheider Weg 35
D-13467 Berlin / DE
02 / CLEVE, Arwed
Konstanzer Strasse 8
D-10707 Berlin / DE
03 / KLAR, Ulrich
Isegrimsteig 8a
D-13503 Berlin / DE
04 / NEEF, Günter
Markgraf-Albrecht-Strasse 4
D-10711 Berlin / DE
05 / CHWALISZ, Kristof
Lobbersteig 7a
D-13503 Berlin / DE
06 / SCHNEIDER, Martin
Schluchseestrasse 6a
D-13469 Berlin / DE
07 / FUHRMANN, Ulrike
Charlottenburger Ufer 4
D-10587 Berlin / DE
08 / HESS-STUMPP, Holger
Malplaquetstrasse 8
D-13347 Berlin / DE
[2000/02]
Application number, filing date98905419.209.02.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998EP00752
Priority number, dateDE199710606107.02.1997         Original published format: DE 19706061
[2000/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9834947
Date:13.08.1998
Language:DE
[1998/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970103
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0970103
Date:17.04.2002
Language:DE
[2002/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.08.1998
ClassificationIPC:C07J41/00, A61K31/56, C07J53/00, C07J1/00, C07J43/00
[2000/02]
CPC:
C07J1/0033 (EP,US); C07J41/00 (KR); A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/04 (EP); A61P15/18 (EP); A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P5/36 (EP); C07J41/0083 (EP,US); C07J41/0094 (EP,US);
C07J43/003 (EP,US); C07J53/002 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/02]
Extension statesAL27.08.1999
LT27.08.1999
LV27.08.1999
RO27.08.1999
SI27.08.1999
TitleGerman:ANTIGESTAGEN WIRKSAME STEROIDE MIT FLUORIERTER 17ALPHA-ALKYLKETTE[2000/02]
English:ANTIGESTAGENIC STEROIDS WITH A FLUORINATED 17ALPHA-ALKYL CHAIN[2000/02]
French:STEROIDES A ACTIVITE ANTIGESTAGENE A CHAINE 17ALPHA-ALKYLE FLUOREE[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase27.08.1999National basic fee paid 
27.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
27.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.06.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
04.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.04.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.05.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.09.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.10.2001Fee for grant paid
05.10.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.01.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
19.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
21.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP0245170  (ROUSSEL UCLAF [FR]) [Y] 1-29 * page 23, line 55 * * page 26, line 18 * * page 28, line 10 ** page 33, line 2 *;
 [Y]EP0299913  (SCHERING AG [DE]) [Y] 1-29 * page 2, line 63 * * page 5, line 23 - line 28 *;
 [Y]DE3844408  (ROUSSEL UCLAF [FR]) [Y] 1-29 * page 2, line 55 - line 58; examples 2,6B *;
 [Y]EP0369881  (ROUSSEL UCLAF [FR]) [Y] 1-29 * page 3, line 49 - line 51; example 3 *;
 CN1100729  [ ] (SHANGHAI INST ORGANIC CHEM [CN]);
 [Y]  - WANG Z ET AL, "Preparation of trifluoromethyl steroids as postcoital contraceptives", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19951120), vol. 123, no. 21, Database accession no. 286388, XP002065659 [Y] 1-29 * abstract *
    [ ] - THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS FORMULA INDEX, VOLUME 123, C26 H28 BR N3 O3-Z, COLUMBUS OHIO US, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, (1995) [ ] * siehe Seite 4377F, Spalte 1, formula C27 H32 F3 N O2 (Registry Number 161225-93-0) *
 [Y]  - WANG Z ET AL, "Trifluoromethylation of steroidal ketones", JOURNAL OF FLUORINE CHEMISTRY., LAUSANNE CH, (199410), vol. 69, no. 1, pages 1 - 3, XP002065658 [Y] 1-29 * siehe Seite 1, Verbindung 2 und Seite 2, Spalte 1, Absatz 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-1139(94)03096-0
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.