blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0970171

EP0970171 - DETERGENT GRANULE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.02.2004
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip20.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.04.2004  [2004/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SORRIE, Graham, Alexander
Lancaster Park, 14 Curlew Hill
Northumberland NE61 3SH / GB
02 / ASKEW, Stuart, Clive
17 Mayfair Road, West Jesmond
Newcastle upon Tyne NE2 3DN / GB
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Peet, Jillian Wendy, et al
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited
Whitley Road
Longbenton
Newcastle upon Tyne
NE12 9TS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/26]Peet, Jillian Wendy, et al
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited, Whitley Road, Longbenton
Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB
Former [2002/47]Lawrence, Peter Robin Broughton, et al
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Former [2000/02]Peet, Jillian Wendy, et al
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited, Whitley Road, Longbenton
Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB
Application number, filing date98905572.816.03.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998IB00357
Priority number, dateGB1997000633720.03.1997         Original published format: GB 9706337
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9842811
Date:01.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970171
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.10.1998
ClassificationIPC:C11D3/00, C11D3/10, C11D3/20
[2000/02]
CPC:
C11D3/2086 (EP); C11D11/0082 (EP); C11D3/0052 (EP);
C11D3/10 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/02]
TitleGerman:WASCHMITTELGRANULAT[2000/02]
English:DETERGENT GRANULE[2000/02]
French:GRANULE DETERGENT[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase27.09.1999National basic fee paid 
27.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
27.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
10.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.09.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/15]
29.10.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/15]
Request for further processing for:06.03.2003Request for further processing filed
19.03.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
03.04.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
05.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
04.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
05.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]CH659082  (CIBA GEIGY AG) [X] 1-15 * see page 3, column 3, lines 45,46; page 3, column 2, line 1; page 4, column 2, line 25 - page 5, column 1, line 34; examples 1,2,14-17; claims 1-10 *;
 [X]US4252664  (INAMORATO JACK T) [X] 1,3,9 * column 4, line 42 - line 51; claim 1 *;
 [X]US3769224  (INAMORATO J) [X] 1,3,9 * column 4, line 28 - line 36; claim 1 *;
 [DA]WO9113678  (HENKEL KGAA) [DA] 13,14 * page 8, line 27 - page 9, line 3; figures 1-11; examples 1-9; claims 1-23 *;
 [DA]WO9102047  (HENKEL KGAA) [DA] 13,14 * see page 10, line 28 - page 1, line 6; page 14, lines 5-24; claims 1-11; examples 1-10 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.