EP0979647 - FAT EMULSION FOR ORAL ADMINISTRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Shinyaku Co., Ltd. 14, Kisshoin Nishinosho Monguchicho, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8550 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/07] | For all designated states Nippon Shinyaku Co., Ltd. 14, Kisshoin-Nishinosho-Monguchicho, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8550 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKUI, Hiroshi 50-17, Oguracho Minamihoriike Uji-shi Kyoto 611-0042 / JP | 02 /
SEKI, Junzo 13-11, Nishiekimaecho Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-0032 / JP | [2000/07] | Representative(s) | Strych, Werner Maximilian Josef, et al Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/07] | Strych, Werner Maximilian Josef, Dr., et al Hansmann & Vogeser, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98905661.9 | 25.02.1998 | [2000/07] | WO1998JP00786 | Priority number, date | JP19970043495 | 27.02.1997 Original published format: JP 4349597 | [2000/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9837869 | Date: | 03.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0979647 | Date: | 16.02.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.09.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/107, A61K9/14 | [2000/07] | CPC: |
A61K9/1075 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/07] | Title | German: | FETTEMULSION ZUR ORALEN VERABREICHUNG | [2000/07] | English: | FAT EMULSION FOR ORAL ADMINISTRATION | [2000/07] | French: | EMULSION GRASSE S'ADMINISTRANT PAR VOIE ORALE | [2000/07] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.1999 | Translation filed | 04.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.1999 | Search fee paid | 04.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 04.08.1999 | Examination requested [2000/07] | 10.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/17] | 08.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH01143826 ; | [X]JPH01249716 ; | [XY]EP0315079 (NIPPON SHINYAKU CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-6,10 * page 3, line 9 - page 5, line 23 * * page 5, line 33 - line 57 * * examples 1,3-10 * * claims 1-7 * [Y] 7-9,11-20; | [Y]US4880634 (SPEISER PETER [CH]) [Y] 11-20 * column 4, line 1 - line 25 * * column 5, line 27 * * column 8, line 48 - column 9, line 19 * * claim 1 *; | [XY]EP0556394 (NIPPON SHINYAKU CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-10 * examples 1-7 * * claims 1,2 * [Y] 11-20; | [Y]WO9408604 (AFFINITY BIOTECH INC [US], et al) [Y] 7-9,11-20 * page 12, line 8 - line 22 * * page 15, line 30 - page 16, line 2 * * page 19, line 36 - page 29, line 5 * * page 21, line 12 - line 19 * * page 23, line 34 - line 37 * * page 25, line 33 - page 26, line 25 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1989, no. 28, Database accession no. 1989-204077, XP002194434 & JPH01143826 A 19890606 (TAISHO PHARM CO LTD) [X] 1,3-5 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1989, no. 46, Database accession no. 1989-335875, XP002194433 & JPH01249716 A 19891005 (TAISHO PHARM CO LTD) [X] 1,3-5 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPS6156122 (RENTSCHLER ARZNEIMITTEL); | [X]JPH02203 (NIPPON SHINYAKU CO LTD); | [Y]WO9207552 (NIPPON SHINYAKU CO LTD [JP]) |