EP0963832 - SOFT TRANSPARENT POLYETHYLENE RESIN SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/50] | SOFT TRANSPARENT POLYETHYLENE RESIN SHEET AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | ||
[2001/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2003 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO., LTD. 6-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | [1999/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJII, Atsushi 841-3, Kou, Shirahama-cho Himeji-shi, Hyogo-ken 672-8021 / JP | 02 /
YUKUMOTO, Tohru 841-3, Kou, Shirahama-cho Himeji-shi, Hyogo-ken 672-8021 / JP | 03 /
FUJIWARA, Kenichi 841-3, Kou, Shirahama-cho Himeji-shi, Hyogo-ken 672-8021 / JP | 04 /
NAGAO, Tomohiro 841-3, Kou, Shirahama-cho Himeji-shi, Hyogo-ken 672-8021 / JP | [1999/50] | Representative(s) | Hucker, Charlotte Jane Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/50] | Hucker, Charlotte Jane Gill Jennings & Every Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 98905691.6 | 26.02.1998 | [1999/50] | WO1998JP00818 | Priority number, date | JP19970045868 | 28.02.1997 Original published format: JP 4586897 | [1999/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9838022 | Date: | 03.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0963832 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0963832 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.09.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/88, C08J5/18 | [1999/50] | CPC: |
C08J5/18 (EP,US);
B29C48/08 (EP,US);
B29C48/9145 (EP,US);
B29C48/914 (EP,US);
B29C48/919 (EP,US);
C08J2323/08 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24355 (EP,US);
Y10T428/26 (EP,US);
Y10T428/268 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31855 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31931 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31935 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31938 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1999/50] | Title | German: | WEICHE DURCHSICHTIGE POLYÄTHYLENFOLIE | [2001/47] | English: | SOFT TRANSPARENT POLYETHYLENE RESIN SHEET | [2001/47] | French: | FEUILLE DE RESINE POLYETHYLENE SOUPLE | [2001/47] |
Former [1999/50] | WEICHER DURCHSICHTIGES POLYÄTHYLENBLATT UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | ||
Former [1999/50] | SOFT TRANSPARENT POLYETHYLENE RESIN SHEET AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | ||
Former [1999/50] | FEUILLE DE RESINE POLYETHYLENE SOUPLE ET TRANSPARENTE ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.1999 | Translation filed | 10.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.1999 | Search fee paid | 10.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 13.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/50] | 20.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38] | Request for further processing for: | 25.09.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 25.09.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.10.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.09.2002 | BE | 25.09.2002 | CH | 25.09.2002 | LI | 25.09.2002 | NL | 25.09.2002 | SE | 25.12.2002 | ES | 28.03.2003 | [2004/04] |
Former [2003/48] | AT | 25.09.2002 | |
BE | 25.09.2002 | ||
CH | 25.09.2002 | ||
LI | 25.09.2002 | ||
NL | 25.09.2002 | ||
SE | 25.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/39] | AT | 25.09.2002 | |
CH | 25.09.2002 | ||
LI | 25.09.2002 | ||
NL | 25.09.2002 | ||
SE | 25.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | AT | 25.09.2002 | |
NL | 25.09.2002 | ||
SE | 25.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/30] | NL | 25.09.2002 | |
SE | 25.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/14] | SE | 25.12.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH08156073 ; | [X]JPH07186244 ; | [X]JPH06170919 ; | [A]JPH04353527 ; | [X]GB1417970 (LAMBERG IND RES ASS) [X] 5,6,13,14 * page 4, line 23 - line 60; figures 3-6 *; | [A]EP0165075 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]) [A] 1 * page 8, line 25 - line 31 *; | [A]US4954391 (KOTANI TERUMITSU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * table 1 *; | [A]EP0614748 (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1,5* page 7, line 46 - line 47 *; | [X]EP0687545 (IPEC CO LTD [JP]) [X] 5,6,8-10 * column 4, line 1 - line 4; figure 1; claims 1,6,8 *; | [A]EP0716911 (TAISEI KAKO CO [JP]) [A] 8 * page 7, line 10 - line 18 * * page 4, line 23 - line 30; figures 1-2B *; | [PX]EP0803340 (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP]) [PX] 5-7,9-11 * figures 1-5; claims 1-15 *; | [E]EP0838321 (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP]) [E] 1,5-14 * claims 1,6,31,32 *; | [E]DE19730893 (RASSELSTEIN HOESCH GMBH [DE]) [E] 5 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961031), vol. 1996, no. 10, & JP08156073 A 19960618 (PLACO CO LTD) [X] 5 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 95, no. 38, Database accession no. 1995-288997, XP002040636 & JPH07186244 A 19950725 (IPEC KK) [X] 5 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 94, no. 29, Database accession no. 1994-238143, XP002040629 & JPH06170919 A 19940621 (IPEC KK) [X] 5 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 03, Database accession no. 1993-024301, XP002122665 & JPH04353527 A 19921208 (TORAY IND INC) [A] 1 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPS6241457B ; | [A]JPS6360726 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD); | [A]JPH03277528 (CHISSO CORP); | [A]JPH0655613 (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO); | [A]JPH07258348 (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO) |