EP0970986 - GRANULAR POWDER OF MODIFIED POLYTETRAFLUOROETHYLENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.04.2005 [2005/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LIMITED Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-0015 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/02] | For all designated states Daikin Industries, Limited Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0015 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASANO, Michio, Yodogawa-seisakusho Daikin Ind. Ltd 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi Osaka 566-8585 / JP | 02 /
TSUJI, Masayuki, Yodogawa-seisakush Daikin Ind Ltd 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi Osaka 566-8585 / JP | [2000/02] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/02] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98905697.3 | 26.02.1998 | [2000/02] | WO1998JP00825 | Priority number, date | JP19970084490 | 17.03.1997 Original published format: JP 8449097 | [2000/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9841568 | Date: | 24.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0970986 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0970986 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.09.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C08J3/12, C08L27/18, C08J3/205, B29B9/08, // C08L27:18 | [2000/38] | CPC: |
C08J3/12 (EP,KR,US);
B01J20/18 (EP,US);
B01J20/2805 (EP,US);
C08J2327/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/02] | C08J3/12, C08L27/18 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/02] | Title | German: | KÖRNIGES MODIFIZIERTES POLYTETRAFLUOROETHYLENPULVER | [2000/02] | English: | GRANULAR POWDER OF MODIFIED POLYTETRAFLUOROETHYLENE | [2000/02] | French: | POUDRE GRANULAIRE DE POLYTETRAFLUOROETHYLENE MODIFIE | [2000/02] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.1999 | Translation filed | 17.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.1999 | Search fee paid | 17.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 17.09.1999 | Examination requested [2000/02] | 18.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3331822 (YUTAKA KOMETANI, et al) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]US3766133 (ROBERTS R, et al) [A] 1* claim 1 *; | [A]US4368296 (KUHLS JUERGEN [DE], et al) [A] 1 * claim 1 * | International search | [A]JPH03255133 (HOECHST AG); | [A]JPH0413729 (DAIKIN IND LTD); | [A]JPH05112690 (MITSUI DU PONT FLUORCHEMICAL); | [A]WO9316126 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]); | [A]JPH0673189 (DAIKIN IND LTD); | [A]JPH06306179 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) |