EP0961728 - ANCHOR AND METHOD OF UNCOUPLING FOR SUCH ANCHOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.11.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 25.01.2017 [2017/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VRIJHOF ANKERS BEHEER B.V. Meerkoetstraat 83a 2990 AC Krimpen a/d Ijssel / NL | [1999/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEGENKAMP, Gijsbertus Oosteinde 21 NL-2271 EA Voorburg / NL | [1999/49] | Representative(s) | Ferguson, Alexander, et al Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade B.V. P.O. Box 266 2501 AW Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1999/49] | Ferguson, Alexander, et al Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade, P.O. Box 266 2501 AW Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 98905878.9 | 20.02.1998 | [1999/49] | WO1998NL00102 | Priority number, date | NL19971005353 | 24.02.1997 Original published format: NL 1005353 | [1999/49] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9836963 | Date: | 27.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0961728 | Date: | 08.12.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0961728 | Date: | 23.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B63B21/46, B63B21/22, // E02D5/80 | [1999/49] | CPC: |
E02D5/803 (EP,US);
B63B21/22 (EP,US);
B63B21/46 (EP,US);
B63B2021/262 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, MC, NL [1999/49] | Title | German: | ANKER UND ENTKUPPLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EINEN SOLCHEN | [1999/49] | English: | ANCHOR AND METHOD OF UNCOUPLING FOR SUCH ANCHOR | [1999/49] | French: | ANCRE ET PROCEDE DE DEGAGEMENT D'UNE TELLE ANCRE | [1999/49] | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.1998 | Translation filed | 11.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/49] | 17.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]JPH03208791 ; | [XA]JPS6067289 ; | [XA]US2007667 (EDWIN STUBBS GEORGE) [X] 33-35 * figures 1-4 * * page 1, column R, line 38 - line 54 * [A] 1,30,31; | [XA]US3450088 (GUIER WILLIAM) [X] 33-35 * figures 1-4 * [A] 1,2,4,14,15,30; | [XA]US4230062 (FORNASIERO PETER J) [X] 33-35 * the whole document * [A] 1,18,20,25,30,31; | [A]EP0297703 (KOBAYASHI SATORU); | [XA]FR2644748 (DUCLOUX JEAN [FR]) [X] 34 * the whole document * [A] 1,18,20,25,30-32; | [AD]WO9303958 (VRIJHOF ANKERS BEHEER BV [NL]) [AD] 1,8,9,14,19,22,26,27,30,34 * figures 1-3,10,11 * * figures 19-23D * * page 17, line 18 - page 19, line 12 * * page 21, line 33 - page 22, line 25 * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911209), vol. 15, no. 485, Database accession no. (M - 1188), & JP03208791 A 19910911 (K. HIKITANI) [X] 1,4,30,31,33-35 * abstract * [A] 14,15,18,19 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850823), vol. 9, no. 206, Database accession no. (M - 406), & JP60067289 A 19850417 (SOUJIROU NAKAMURA) [X] 33-35 * abstract * [A] 1-4,8,9,14,21,26,30,31 | by applicant | NL9200144 | NL9300257 | GB2295505 | GB20100092022 |