EP1011463 - SURGICAL INSTRUMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.03.2005 [2005/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMITH & NEPHEW, INC. 160 Dascomb Road Andover, MA 01810 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | For all designated states Smith & Nephew, Inc. 160 Dascomb Road Andover, MA 01810 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOURQUE, Bernard, J. 17 Fremont Street Taunton, MA 02780 / US | 02 /
LIZARDI, Jose 3 Kayla Drive Franklin, MA 02038 / US | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | Draggett, Peter Thornton, et al Group Patents & Trade Marks Dept. Smith & Nephew Group Research Centre York Science Park Heslington York Y010 5DF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | Draggett, Peter Thornton, et al Group Patents & Trade Marks Dept., Smith & Nephew Group Research Centre, York Science Park Heslington, York Y010 5DF / GB | Application number, filing date | 98906130.4 | 06.02.1998 | [2000/26] | WO1998US02133 | Priority number, date | US19970796984 | 07.02.1997 Original published format: US 796984 | [2000/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9834543 | Date: | 13.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1011463 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.08.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/00, A61B17/28 | [2001/12] | CPC: |
A61B17/29 (EP,US);
A61B17/1608 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0046 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2929 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2931 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2936 (EP,US);
A61B2017/294 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2000/26] | A61B17/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/26] | Title | German: | CHIRURGIE-INSTRUMENT | [2000/26] | English: | SURGICAL INSTRUMENT | [2000/26] | French: | INSTRUMENT CHIRURGICAL | [2000/26] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.1999 | Search fee paid | 26.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.08.1999 | Examination requested [2000/26] | 01.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/11] | 18.10.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5569298 (SCHNELL WILLIAM J [US]) [X] 1,4,6 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3,7,8; | [Y]US5556416 (CLARK GEORGE A [US], et al) [Y] 2,3,7,8 * column 8, line 26 - column 9, line 62; figures 7-12 *; | [X]US5499992 (MEADE JOHN C [US], et al) [X] 1,4-6 * column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 26 * * column 10, line 26 - column 14, line 37; figures 9-18 * | International search | [X]US5275613 (HABER TERRY M [US], et al) | by applicant | US4712545 |